Colorado District Court
Judge:Daniel D Domenico
Referred: Scott T Varholak
Case #: 1:25-cv-01181
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 1:59 AM MDT
Defendant
North American Company For Life and Health Insurance
Represented By
James Robert Silvestro
Ireland Stapleton Pryor & Pascoe PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Phillipa Clark


Docket last updated: 17 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 04/23 12:55 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Theresa M. Correa McMichen on behalf of North American Company For Life and Health InsuranceAttorney Theresa M. Correa McMichen added to party North American Company For Life and Health Insurance(pty:dft) (Correa McMichen, Theresa)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 04/23 12:49 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David R. Konkel on behalf of North American Company For Life and Health InsuranceAttorney David R. Konkel added to party North American Company For Life and Health Insurance(pty:dft) (Konkel, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/21 3:15 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by North American Company For Life and Health Insurance.(Silvestro, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 04/16 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kerri J. Anderson on behalf of Phillipa ClarkAttorney Kerri J. Anderson added to party Phillipa Clark(pty:pla) (Anderson, Kerri)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 04/16 1:47 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bradley Aaron Levin on behalf of Phillipa ClarkAttorney Bradley Aaron Levin added to party Phillipa Clark(pty:pla) (Levin, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
17 17 cmp Complaint Wed 04/23 4:21 PM
State Court COMPLAINT against North American Company For Life and Health Insurance, filed by Phillipa Clark.(cmadr, )
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/15 3:40 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Sammons Financial Group Inc. for North American Company For Life and Health Insurance. (Silvestro, James)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/15 3:34 PM
NOTICE re1 Notice of Removal, Refiling of State Court Documents by Defendant North American Company For Life and Health Insurance(Silvestro, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint and Jury Demand,
Att: 2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet
9 9 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Tue 04/15 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James Robert Silvestro on behalf of North American Company For Life and Health Insurance (Silvestro, James)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/15 1:22 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/15/2025. Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/17/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 6/24/2025 11:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (schap, )
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 04/15 10:52 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/15/2025. Text Only Entry. (rkeec)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Tue 04/15 8:27 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (echa, )
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Case Assigned to Judge Tue 04/15 8:26 AM
Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (echa, )
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Removal: Administrative Notices Tue 04/15 8:25 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. Pursuant to Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a, each of the state court documents shall be individual PDFs. See Appendix B Notice of Removal in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry.) (echa, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Removal: Administrative Notices Tue 04/15 8:25 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE REMINDER to Filer. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1 and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a when filing a Notice of Removal. (Text only entry.) (echa, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases Tue 04/15 8:24 AM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (echa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 04/14 5:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by North American Company For Life and Health Insurance from District Court of Boulder County, Case Number 2025CV030157. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-10277058), filed by North American Company For Life and Health Insurance.(Silvestro, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons, Complaint, District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Docket Sheet