California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott H Yun
Case #: 6:25-bk-12344
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 20, 2025

Debtor
Calzona Truck Sales, Inc.
15689 Valley Blvd
Fontana, CA 92335-6383
Represented By
Michael G Spector
Law Offices Of Michael G. Spector
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Larry D Simons (TR)
Law Offices of Larry D. Simons 3550 Vine Street, Suite 210
Riverside, CA 92507
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 12:56 AM PDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Mon 04/14 3:57 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:6:25-bk-12344] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58287175. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 35 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Mon 04/14 2:48 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Calzona Truck Sales, Inc. (Spector, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Mon 04/14 3:12 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Simons (TR), Larry D with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/20/2025 at 08:00 AM via Zoom - Simons: Meeting ID 495 175 0324, Passcode 3027598776, Phone 1 909 498 7813. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]