California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott H Yun
Case #: 6:25-bk-12346
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 21, 2025

Debtor
Stoneway Capital Corporation
4310 Redwood Hwy Ste 200
San Rafael, CA 94903-2145
Represented By
Michael G Spector
Law Offices Of Michael G. Spector
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Charles W Daff (TR)
100 Spectrum Center Drive Suite 600
Irvine, CA 92618
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 12:57 AM PDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Mon 04/14 3:57 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:6:25-bk-12346] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58287175. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court Case Reassigned (Manual) Mon 04/14 4:55 PM
Judge Scott H. Yun added to case (affiliated to case 6:25-bk-12344-SY - Stoneway Capital Corporation and 6:25-bk-12353-SY (David Robert Stone). Involvement of Judge Mark D. Houle Terminated. (HC)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Mon 04/14 3:04 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Stoneway Capital Corporation (Spector, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Mon 04/14 3:42 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Daff (TR), Charles W with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/21/2025 at 08:00 AM via Zoom - Daff: Meeting ID 551 455 9391, Passcode 4501262424, Phone 1 909 498 8467. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)Notice not mailed. See docket entry #3 for correction. Modified on 4/14/2025 (VN)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset/No POC) (309A/309C) Mon 04/14 5:21 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Charles W Daff (TR) with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/21/2025 at 08:00 AM at Zoom - Daff: Meeting ID 551 455 9391, Passcode 4501262424, Phone 1 909 498 8467. (VN)
Related: [-]