Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-00174
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 2:18 AM CDT
Defendant
Maria Luisa Fortuna-Martinez (1)
Represented By
Elizabeth Ann O'Connell
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Federal Public Defender - Corpus Christi
contact info
Corpus Christi Interpreter
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Corpus Christi MagDuty
contact info
Robert Douglas Thorpe, Jr
Assistant Us Atty
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 3:04 AM CDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
Arrest of Maria Luisa Fortuna-Martinez. (jdr2)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 12, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Maria Luisa Fortuna-Martinez (1), filed. (Kenedy) Initial Appearance set for 4/14/2025 at 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock (jrm2)
Related: [-]