California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Deborah J Saltzman
Case #: 2:25-bk-13059
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Lindo Holdings LLC
236 S Curtis Ave Apt B
Alhambra, CA 91801-3254
Represented By
Marc A Goldbach
Goldbach Law Group
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017
Represented By
Noreen A Madoyan
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
26 26 notice Notice Thu 04/24 6:01 PM
Notice of Non-Consent to Use of Cash Collateral Filed by Creditor First General Bank Related [+]. (James, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral Filed by Debtor Lindo Holdings LLC
25 25 court Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Thu 04/24 11:20 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 5/29/2025 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 1639, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Deborah J. Saltzman (MB2)
Related: [-] 17 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Lindo Holdings LLC
24 24 misc Declaration Thu 04/24 10:28 AM
Declaration re: Allen Liu in Support of Employ Motion Filed by Debtor Lindo Holdings LLC. (Goldbach, Marc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
23 23 misc Declaration Wed 04/23 7:41 PM
Declaration re: MAG in Supp of Employ Motion Filed by Debtor Lindo Holdings LLC. (Goldbach, Marc)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of motion/application Wed 04/23 7:33 PM
Notice of motion/application Amended Filed by Debtor Lindo Holdings LLC Related [+]. (Goldbach, Marc)
Related: [-] 17 Application to Employ Marc Aaron Goldbach/Goldbach Law Group as General BK Counsel Filed by Debtor Lindo Holdings LLC
21 21 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Wed 04/23 3:07 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect hearing time was selected (on page one). THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE AN AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING WITH THE CORRECT HEARING INFORMATION. Related [+] (MB2)
Related: [-] 20 Notice of motion/application filed by Debtor Lindo Holdings LLC
20 20 notice Notice of motion/application Wed 04/23 2:21 PM
Notice of motion/application Filed by Debtor Lindo Holdings LLC Related [+]. (Goldbach, Marc)
Related: [-] 17 Application to Employ Marc Aaron Goldbach/Goldbach Law Group as General BK Counsel Filed by Debtor Lindo Holdings LLC
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
19 19 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Tue 04/22 5:52 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by James, Jacqueline. (James, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
18 18 court Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Tue 04/22 10:19 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 5/27/2025 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 1639, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Deborah J. Saltzman (MB2)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Lindo Holdings LLC
17 17 13 pgs motion Employ (motion) Tue 04/22 7:23 AM
Application to Employ Marc Aaron Goldbach/Goldbach Law Group as General BK Counsel Filed by Debtor Lindo Holdings LLC (Goldbach, Marc)
Related: [-]
16 16 12 pgs motion Conditional Use of Cash Collateral (motion) Tue 04/22 7:18 AM
Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral Filed by Debtor Lindo Holdings LLC (Goldbach, Marc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Hearing (BK Case) Mon 04/21 4:01 PM
Notice of Hearing Motion For Authority to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Debtor Lindo Holdings LLC. (Goldbach, Marc)
Related: [-]
14 14 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Mon 04/21 8:13 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other - Motion must be filed separately on the docket. Bankruptcy Events BK - Motions/Applications Use Cash Collateral (motion) Related [+] (MB2)
Related: [-] 11 Notice of Opportunity To Request a Hearing On Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)) filed by Debtor Lindo Holdings LLC
13 13 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Mon 04/21 8:10 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other - Motion must be filed separately on the docket. Bankruptcy Events BK - Motions/Applications Employ (motion) Related [+] (MB2)
Related: [-] 10 Notice of Opportunity To Request a Hearing On Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)) filed by Debtor Lindo Holdings LLC
Saturday, April 19, 2025
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 04/19 9:15 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
11 11 notice Notice of Opportunity To Request a Hearing On Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)) Sat 04/19 2:04 PM
Notice of Opportunity To Request a Hearing On Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)) Use of Cash Collateral Filed by Debtor Lindo Holdings LLC. (Goldbach, Marc)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Opportunity To Request a Hearing On Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)) Sat 04/19 1:42 PM
Notice of Opportunity To Request a Hearing On Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)) Application to Employ General Counsel Filed by Debtor Lindo Holdings LLC. (Goldbach, Marc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
9 9 misc Proof of service Fri 04/18 5:22 PM
Proof of service Order Setting Scheduling and Case Management Conference Filed by Debtor Lindo Holdings LLC Related [+]. (Goldbach, Marc)
Related: [-] 6 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, April 17, 2025
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 04/17 9:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 04/17/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1)
7 7 court Hearing Set (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option) Thu 04/17 5:38 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 5/29/2025 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 1639, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Deborah J. Saltzman. In person appearances are required for the initial status conference. Must ask for permission to appear by Zoom, if unable to appear in person. (MB2)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Lindo Holdings LLC
6 6 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 04/17 5:28 PM
Order Setting Scheduling and Case Management Conference. Status conference set on May 29, 2025 at 1:00 P.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/17/2025 (MB2)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
5 5 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1) Tue 04/15 12:16 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/6/2025 at 09:30 AM at UST-LA3, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-811-2961, PARTICIPANT CODE:9609127. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/7/2025. (LL2)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Debtor's Request to Activate Electronic Noticing (DeBN) Tue 04/15 6:35 AM
Debtor's Request to Activate Electronic Noticing (DeBN) Filed by Debtor Lindo Holdings LLC. (Goldbach, Marc)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs misc Chapter 11 or Chapter 9: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insi Tue 04/15 6:35 AM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual:: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders (Form 104 or 204) Filed by Debtor Lindo Holdings LLC. (Goldbach, Marc)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 04/15 6:33 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Corporate parents added to case: Lindo Holdings LLC. Filed by Debtor Lindo Holdings LLC. (Goldbach, Marc)
Related: [-]
1 1 50 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 04/15 6:29 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Lindo Holdings LLC (Goldbach, Marc)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 04/15 6:29 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:2:25-bk-13059] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58288665. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1