New York Western District Court
Judge:Meredith A Vacca
Case #: 1:25-cv-00330
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause28:7422 Appeal from Administrative Decision
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 11:06 AM EDT
Defendant
Todd Lyons, his official capacity as Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Defendant
Kristi Noem, in her official capacity as Secretary of Homeland Security
Plaintiff
Kiran Siddapura Manjunatha
Represented By
Aaron J. Aisen
Richards Jurusik Immigration Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/22 10:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam A. Khalil on behalf of All Defendants (Khalil, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
4 4 order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/21 10:38 AM
TEXT ORDER granting3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Hon. Meredith A. Vacca on 04/21/2025. (JCL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/17 11:30 PM
MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5459789.) by Kiran Siddapura Manjunatha.(Aisen, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attorney Sponsor AFfidavit,
Att: 2 Attorney Oath,
Att: 3 Civility Principles and Guidelines Oath,
Att: 4 Certificates of Good Standing,
Att: 5 Attorney Database and ECF Form
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued as to USA Wed 04/16 1:49 PM
Summons Issued as to Todd Lyons, Kristi Noem, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (TMK)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/16 1:44 PM
Case Assigned to Hon. Meredith A. Vacca. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
Related: [-]
adr Automatic Referral to Mediation Wed 04/16 1:45 PM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Pursuant to Section 2.1(A) of the Plan for Alternative Dispute Resolution in the United States District Court for the Western District of New York (the ADR Plan), this case is automatically referred to ADR. To access the ADR Plan and for inquiries regarding the Court's ADR Program please review the Court's[LINK:ADR webpage] and/or contact the Court's ADR Administrator at[LINK:adrprogram@nywd.uscourts.gov] . Prior to the Local Rule 16 scheduling conference, counsel and unrepresented parties shall review the [LINK:ADR Plan] and confer with each other regarding ADR for this case. Unless the parties agree to a different intervention, it is presumed they will participate in mediation. The parties shall be prepared to report on the outcome of their ADR discussion at the scheduling conference, as the initial Scheduling Order for this case will establish ADR deadlines in accordance with the ADR Plan. (TMK)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Wed 04/16 1:45 PM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (TMK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/15 10:54 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 405 receipt number ANYWDC-5456414, filed by Kiran Siddapura Manjunatha.(Aisen, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons to Lyons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons to Noem,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons to Attorney General,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons to USA WDNY