Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Reed C O'Connor
Referred: Hal R Ray, Jr
Case #: 4:25-cv-00411
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 10:07 AM CDT
Defendant
Bryan Collier - Director of TDCJ
Defendant
Becky Mitchell
Defendant
Texas Board of Pardons Paroles - David G. Gutierrez
Plaintiff
Terry Lee Morris
9013 Karen's Corner
Alvarado, TX 76009


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
9 9 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/08 9:24 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Terry Lee Morris (mmw) (Main Document 9 replaced on 5/8/2025) (mmw). (Main Document 9 replaced on 5/8/2025) (mmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order And Notice of Deficiency Tue 04/22 2:41 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER: The Court finds that Plaintiff's2 IFP application is deficient and DENIES it without prejudice to his right to file a proper IFP application. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/22/2025) (mmw)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 04/22 2:42 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Tue Apr 22 14:41:59 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
7 7 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Tue 04/15 10:56 AM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (hcc)
Related: [-]
6 6 qcref O' Connor (FORT WORTH CASES) Tue 04/15 10:55 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Ray preliminarily assigned. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] index and to the prior sanctions found within the[LINK:circuit] index.) File to: Appropriate Staff Attorney. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr. (hcc)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Appoint Counsel Tue 04/15 10:38 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Terry Lee Morris (see doc1 for image) (hcc)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/15 10:36 AM
MOTION for Service by United States Marshal filed by Terry Lee Morris (hcc)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Tue 04/15 10:22 AM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Terry Lee Morris (Clerk's Note: Clerk declines to issue summons at this time as Motion for IFP is pending). (hcc)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/15 10:07 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Terry Lee Morris (hcc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/15 9:57 AM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Bryan Collier - Director of TDCJ, Becky Mitchell, Texas Board of Pardons Paroles - David G. Gutierrez filed by Terry Lee Morris. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (hcc)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 04/15 10:57 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6,7. Tue Apr 15 10:57:49 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]