New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John K Sherwood
Case #: 2:25-bk-13910
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 14, 2025

Debtor
38 Headley NJ LLC
38 Headley Ter
Irvington, NJ 07111-1321
Represented By
38 Headley NJ LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
David Wolff
David Wolff, Chapter 7 Trustee 750 Route 34 Suite 11
Matawan, NJ 07747
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 1:03 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 04/15 12:17 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Filed by 38 Headley NJ LLC . (dlr)Modified TEXT on 4/15/2025 (dlr). Additional attachment(s) added on 4/15/2025 (dlr)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Automatic Assignment - Meeting of Creditors 7 (business, no asset) Tue 04/15 12:23 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors and Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Wolff, David with 341(a)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Show Cause Tue 04/15 12:37 PM
Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Corporate Debtor Without Counsel,Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury For Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Statement of Corporate Ownership, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/15/2025. Hearing scheduled for 5/6/2025 at 10:00 AM, JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark.. (dlr)
Related: [-]