Wood v. Piramal Critical Care
Montana District Court | |
Judge: | Brian Morris |
Case #: | 6:25-cv-00034 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2025 |
Case in other court: | MT 1st Judicial DIstrict Court, L & C County, DV-25-02025-127-DS |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 11:05 AM MDT |
Defendant
Piramal Critical Care
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sara Wood
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, May 19, 2025 | ||
utility
Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 05/19 8:02 AM
Terminate Deadlines10 Amended Pldgs ddl 5/16/25. (ACC) |
||
Tuesday, May 06, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 6/23/2025. Joint Discovery Plan due by 6/23/2025. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 6/23/2025. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 6/25/2025 at 02:30 PM before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/6/2025. (KAH) |
|
Friday, May 02, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Clerk's Notice of Reassignment - MT
Fri 05/02 4:18 PM
Clerk's Notice of Reassignment. Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1 and objection having been made to the jurisdiction of an U.S. Magistrate Judge, this case is reassigned to Judge Brian Morris. Please update case number on future filings to: CV-25-34-H-BMM. (SAJ) |
|
10 | 10
![]() ORDER granting9 Joint MOTION to Vacate Responsive Pleading Deadline and Set Briefing Schedule filed by Piramal Critical Care. It is therefore ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiff to file her amended complaint is May 16, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 5/2/2025. (ACC) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Joint MOTION to Vacate Responsive Pleading Deadline and Set Briefing Schedule . Keeley Onna Cronin appearing for Defendant Piramal Critical Care. (Cronin, Keeley) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, April 28, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Individual Party Notice Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge form. (HEG) |
|
Tuesday, April 22, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Monday, April 21, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended up to and including May 5, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 4/21/2025. (KJC) |
|
Friday, April 18, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint . Keeley Onna Cronin appearing for Defendant Piramal Critical Care. (Cronin, Keeley) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, April 15, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Corporate Disclosure/Notice of Interested Parties by Piramal Critical Care identifying Corporate Parent Piramal Pharma Ltd. for Piramal Critical Care. (Cronin, Keeley) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Service of Notification of Assignment to Magistrate Judge form. Objection to USMJ Form due by 5/2/2025. (Copy mailed to Wood) (MMS) |
|
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re1 Notice of Removal. (Mailed to Wood along with copy of docket sheet) (MMS) |
|
Monday, April 14, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Piramal Critical Care from Mt 1st Judicial District Court, L & C County, case number DV 25-2025 127-DS., filed by Piramal Critical Care. (HEG) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 04/15 9:29 AM
Filing fee received: $ 405, receipt number AMTDC-3464313 (HEG) |