Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:25-bk-20035

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Daniel S Oppermanbaycity
Case #: 1:25-ap-02015
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
RPM Auto Sales Inc
4083 N. DORT HIGHWAY
Flint, MI 48506
Represented By
RPM Auto Sales Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Rebekah Jean Anton
716 Taylor
Bay City, MI 48708
Represented By
Matthew Lee Frey
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
7 7 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Fri 04/18 3:24 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (cmcl)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 04/18 12:03 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Plaintiff Rebekah Jean Anton. (Frey, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 04/15 1:49 PM
Summons Service Executed on RPM Auto Sales Inc 4/14/2025 (Frey, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Striking Document (text) Tue 04/15 12:52 PM
Order of the Court to Strike: This pleading is stricken from the record because the case caption is incorrect/incomplete (Please note the case caption includes two Bankruptcy Case numbers, and is missing the Adversary Proceeding case number). Related [+]. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Daniel S. Opperman (MSK)
Related: [-] Summons Service Executed3 Summons Service Executed
Monday, April 14, 2025
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 04/14 2:50 PM
THIS PLEADING HAS BEEN STRICKEN PER ORDER OF THE COURT DATED 04/15/2025. Summons Service Executed on RPM Auto Sales Inc 4/14/2025 (Frey, Matthew). MODIFIED ON 04/15/2025 (admin)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 04/14 1:24 PM
Summons Issued on RPM Auto Sales Inc Answer Due 05/14/2025 (Frey, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/14 1:24 PM
Adversary case 25-02015 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Rebekah Jean Anton against RPM Auto Sales Inc. Receipt Number EXEMPT, Fee Amount of $ 350.00 is Exempt. (Frey, Matthew)
Related: [-]