Arizona District Court
Judge:Jennifer G Zipps
Case #: 4:25-cv-00175
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 11:04 AM MST
Defendant
John Cantu
Defendant
Todd M Lyons
Defendant
Kristi Noem
Defendant
Donald J Trump
Plaintiff
Unknown Party
Represented By
Jesse Evans-Schroeder
Green Evans-Schroeder PLLC
contact info
Matthew Harrison Green
Green Evans-Schroeder PLLC
contact info

GPO Apr 15 2025
ORDER granting 2 Motion for TRO.. Signed by Senior Judge James A Soto on 4/15/2025. (KR)
GPO May 06 2025
ORDERED that the following briefing schedule shall govern the preliminary injunction proceedings in these cases: Defendants shall file their consolidated Response to Plaintiffs' Motions for Preliminary Injunction no later than May 16, 2025. Plaintiffs shall file their Reply no later than May 23, 2025. The parties shall file their Joint Prehearing Statement no later than May 30, 2025. The parties shall appear for a hearing on the motions for preliminary injunction on Thursday, June 5, 2025 at 9:00 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Temporary Restraining Order in Case 25-CV-00175-TUC, issued on April 15, 2025 and extended through May 13, 2025, the Temporary Restraining Order in Case 25-CV-00183-TUC, issued on April 25, 2025, are extended, under the same terms, until the Court issues its decision on Plaintiffs' Motions for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief District Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 5/6/25. (See attached Order for complete details.)(MYE) (MYE)

Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM MST
Monday, May 12, 2025
24 24 2 pgs order Order Mon 05/12 12:19 PM
ORDERED that Defendants shall ensure that each Plaintiff's reinstated SEVIS record is reinstated retroactive to the date of the Defendants' termination of that record. Signed by Chief District Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 5/12/25. (MYE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
23 23 minutes ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order Setting Hearing on Motion Tue 05/06 3:10 PM
ORDERED that the following briefing schedule shall govern the preliminary injunction proceedings in these cases: Defendants shall file their consolidated Response to Plaintiffs' Motions for Preliminary Injunction no later than May 16, 2025. Plaintiffs shall file their Reply no later than May 23, 2025. The parties shall file their Joint Prehearing Statement no later than May 30, 2025. The parties shall appear for a hearing on the motions for preliminary injunction on Thursday, June 5, 2025 at 9:00 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Temporary Restraining Order in Case 25-CV-00175-TUC, issued on April 15, 2025 and extended through May 13, 2025, the Temporary Restraining Order in Case 25-CV-00183-TUC, issued on April 25, 2025, are extended, under the same terms, until the Court issues its decision on Plaintiffs' Motions for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief District Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 5/6/25. (See attached Order for complete details.)(MYE) (MYE)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
22 22 minutes Status Conference Mon 05/05 2:14 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief District Judge Jennifer G Zipps: Status Conference held on 5/5/2025. The Court orders that the defense response is due May 16, 2025, and shall not exceed 30 pages. The plaintiff's reply is due May 23, 2025, and is capped at 20 pages, if more pages required, the plaintiff shall make that request in advance so that the Court can consider it. It is ordered that the joint pre-hearing statement is due May 30, 2025. After receiving the joint statement, the Court will set a preliminary injunction hearing. (SEE ATTACHED PDF FOR FURTHER DETAILS) A formal order will be issued. (Court Reporter Anni Bryan.) Hearing held 10:04 a.m. to 10:53 a.m..(ARS)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
21 21 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 05/02 3:19 PM
ORDERED that current briefing deadlines in the three above-captioned cases are stayed. A hearing is set for Monday, May 5, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. to discuss the Court's proposed coordinated briefing plan and potential deadlines and hearing dates. Signed by Chief District Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 5/2/25. (MYE)
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Transfer Related Case Fri 05/02 12:36 PM
ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer is GRANTED. (Doc.12 .) The deadlines previously set by this Court (Doc. 19) remain in effect until further order of the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that CV-25-175-TUC-AMM be TRANSFERRED to Chief Judge Zipps and shall hereafter reflect the case number CV-25-175-TUC-JGZ. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to LRCiv 42.1(e), the Clerk of Court shall transmit a copy of this Order to Chief Judge Zipps. Signed by District Judge Angela M Martinez on 5/2/25. (MYE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
19 19 minutes ~Util - Set Motion Hearing ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 05/01 4:50 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, Government shall file a supplemental briefing to Plaintiff's2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, no later than 5pm on 5/5/25. Plaintiff shall file a supplemental reply to their2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by 5/8/25. The parties shall meet and confer no later than 5/7/25 to discuss and prepare a joint pre-hearing statement to be filed no later than 5/9/25. Counsel must provide a Notice to Court Reporter to facilitate the creation of an accurate record by no later than 5/12/25. A hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for 5/13/25 at 10:00 am. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by District Judge Angela M Martinez on 5/1/25. (BAC)(BAC)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Supplement Thu 05/01 3:59 PM
SUPPLEMENT Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer by Defendants John Cantu, Todd M Lyons, Kristi Noem, Donald J Trump.(Linton, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
17 17 misc Transcript Request Wed 04/30 8:20 AM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by John Cantu, Todd M Lyons, Kristi Noem, Donald J Trump for proceedings held on April 29, 2025, Judge Angela M. Martinez hearing judge(s). (Linton, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
16 16 misc Transcript Tue 04/29 4:54 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 4/29/2025 before District Judge Angela M. Martinez. Court Reporter Cindy J. Shearman, RDR, CRR, CRC, telephone number 520-205-4286. The ordering party receives the transcript directly from the Court Reporter. Therefore, transcripts should not be viewed through Pacer. A non-ordering party may view a transcript at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Pacer. Redaction Request due 5/20/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/30/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2025. (CJS)
Related: [-]
15 15 minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Transfer Related Case Tue 04/29 1:36 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Angela M Martinez: Motion Hearing held on 4/29/2025 regarding2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arizona Student DOE #2. The Court hears from the parties. The Court grants3 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym. Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym and Motion for Protective Order/Order Not to Detain8 granted in part. The Court takes under advisement12 Motion to Transfer Related Case. Defendant shall supplement their response to Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer no later than noon on Friday May 2, 2025. (See attached PDF for more information). (Court Reporter Cindy Shearman.) Hearing held 10:03am to 10:35am.(TAD)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Transcript Request Tue 04/29 11:51 AM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Arizona Student DOE #2 for proceedings held on April 29, 2025, Judge Angela M. Martinez hearing judge(s).(Green, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Justification Letter
Monday, April 28, 2025
13 13 respm Response to Motion to Consolidate/Transfer Cases Mon 04/28 4:21 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:12 MOTION to Transfer Related Case filed by John Cantu, Todd M Lyons, Kristi Noem, Donald J Trump.(Fellrath, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit 1 - SEVIS Notice
Friday, April 25, 2025
12 12 motion Transfer Related Case Fri 04/25 8:39 AM
MOTION to Transfer Related Case by Arizona Student DOE #2. (Associated Cases: CV 25-0175 TUC-AMM, CV 25-0174 JGZ174-) (Green, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, Motion to Transfer
Thursday, April 24, 2025
11 11 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 04/24 4:38 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:8 MOTION to Supplement Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym re3 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief MOTION for Protective Order /Order Not to Detain ,3 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym,2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arizona Student DOE #2.(Green, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit Index and Exhibits A-M
Monday, April 21, 2025
10 10 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/21 4:32 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re:8 MOTION to Supplement Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym re3 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief MOTION for Protective Order /Order Not to Detain ,3 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym filed by John Cantu, Todd M Lyons, Kristi Noem, Donald J Trump. (Linton, Michael)
Related: [-]
9 9 respm Response to Motion Mon 04/21 4:27 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Cantu, Todd M Lyons, Kristi Noem, Donald J Trump.(Linton, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Sunday, April 20, 2025
8 8 motion Supplement Protective Order Sun 04/20 6:14 PM
MOTION to Supplement Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym re3 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, MOTION for Protective Order /Order Not to Detain by Arizona Student DOE #2.(Green, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
7 7 3 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Tue 04/15 3:13 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for TRO.. Signed by Senior Judge James A Soto on 4/15/2025. (KR)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 04/15 8:34 AM
Summons Issued as to Donald J Trump, John Cantu, Todd M Lyons, Kristi Noem.(MYE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
Monday, April 14, 2025
5 5 misc New Case Opened Tue 04/15 8:29 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-24186329. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Angela M Martinez. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-25-175-TUC-AMM. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Submitted Tue 04/15 8:27 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Arizona Student DOE #2. (Green, Matthew)(MYE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
3 3 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/15 8:26 AM
MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym by Arizona Student DOE #2. (Green, Matthew)(MYE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
2 2 motion Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction Tue 04/15 8:22 AM
EMERGENCY EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - HEARING REQUESTED by Arizona Student DOE #2. (Green, Matthew)(MYE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Index,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Proposed Order
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/15 8:16 AM
COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (TRO Requested). Filing fee received: $ 405.00, receipt number AAZDC-24186329 filed by Arizona Student DOE #2. (Green, Matthew)(MYE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet