California Southern District Court
Judge:Janis L Sammartino
Referred: David D Leshner
Case #: 3:25-cv-00886
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:0702 Administrative Procedure Act - Right of Review
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 11:04 AM PDT
Defendant
Scott Bessent
Represented By
U S Attorney CV
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Defendant
Pam Bondi
Represented By
U S Attorney CV
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Defendant
Financial Crimes Enforcement Network
Represented By
U S Attorney CV
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Defendant
Andrea Gacki
Represented By
U S Attorney CV
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Department of the Treasury
Represented By
U S Attorney CV
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Plaintiff
Esperanza Gomez Escobar
Represented By
Elizabeth L. Sanz
Institute For Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Novedades Y Servicios, Inc.
Represented By
Elizabeth L. Sanz
Institute For Justice
contact info

GPO Apr 22 2025
ORDER Granting 8 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/22/25.(aas)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Sunday, May 11, 2025
43 43 notice Notice (Other) Sun 05/11 1:47 PM
NOTICE of Amended Declaration by Esperanza Gomez Escobar, Novedades Y Servicios, Inc. re22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction(Sanz, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Amended Declaration of Andres Payan, Jr.
Friday, May 09, 2025
42 42 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 05/09 1:51 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Esperanza Gomez Escobar, Money Services Business Association, Inc., Novedades Y Servicios, Inc.. (Sanz, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
41 41 misc Amicus Curiae Appearance Tue 05/06 6:29 PM
Amicus Curiae Appearance entered by Ava Sadeghi on behalf of Money Services Business Association, Inc..(Sadeghi, Ava)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Daniel Silva,
Att: 2 Declaration of Connie Fenchel,
Att: 3 Declaration of Nona Rangel,
Att: 4 Declaration of Lee Jeffrey Ross, Jr.,
Att: 5 Declaration of Kathryn Tomasofsky
40 40 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 05/06 4:28 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Scott Bessent, Pam Bondi, Financial Crimes Enforcement Network, Andrea Gacki, U.S. Department of the Treasury.(Parker, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Andrea Gacki,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 (CTR Screenshots)
Friday, May 02, 2025
39 39 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/02 12:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C. Silva on behalf of Money Services Business Association, Inc. (Silva, Daniel)Attorney Daniel C. Silva added to party Money Services Business Association, Inc.(pty:am)
Related: [-]
38 38 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/02 12:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Samuel Wilson on behalf of Money Services Business Association, Inc. (Wilson, David)Attorney David Samuel Wilson added to party Money Services Business Association, Inc.(pty:am)
Related: [-]
37 37 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/02 12:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ava Sadeghi on behalf of Money Services Business Association, Inc. (Sadeghi, Ava)Attorney Ava Sadeghi added to party Money Services Business Association, Inc.(pty:am)
Related: [-]
36 36 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Fri 05/02 7:12 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Novedades Y Servicios, Inc., Esperanza Gomez Escobar. U.S. Department of the Treasury served. (Sanz, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
35 35 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Fri 05/02 7:12 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Novedades Y Servicios, Inc., Esperanza Gomez Escobar. Financial Crimes Enforcement Network served. (Sanz, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
34 34 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Fri 05/02 7:11 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Novedades Y Servicios, Inc., Esperanza Gomez Escobar. Pam Bondi served. (Sanz, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
33 33 service Summons Returned Executed Summons Returned Executed as to USA Fri 05/02 7:10 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Novedades Y Servicios, Inc., Esperanza Gomez Escobar. Scott Bessent served., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Novedades Y Servicios, Inc., Esperanza Gomez Escobar. Scott Bessent served. (Sanz, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
32 32 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Fri 05/02 7:09 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Novedades Y Servicios, Inc., Esperanza Gomez Escobar. Andrea Gacki served. (Sanz, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
31 31 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Wed 04/30 3:44 PM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Jeffrey T. Rowes, re27 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/30/2025.(rmc)
Related: [-]
30 30 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Wed 04/30 3:43 PM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Katrin Marquez, re28 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/30/2025.(rmc)
Related: [-]
29 29 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Wed 04/30 3:42 PM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Robert E. Johnson, re26 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/30/2025.(rmc)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/30 12:10 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Marquez, Katrin) (rmc)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/30 12:09 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Rowes, Jeffrey) (rmc)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/30 12:06 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Johnson, Robert) (rmc)
Related: [-]
25 25 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Wed 04/30 11:07 AM
ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Jeffrey T. Rowes, re7 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/30/2025.(rmc)
Related: [-]
24 24 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Wed 04/30 11:06 AM
ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Katrin Marquez, re6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/30/2025.(rmc)
Related: [-]
23 23 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Wed 04/30 11:04 AM
ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Robert E. Johnson, re5 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/30/2025.(rmc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
22 22 motion Preliminary Injunction Tue 04/29 5:32 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Esperanza Gomez Escobar, Novedades Y Servicios, Inc..(Sanz, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration of Esperanza Gomez,
Att: 3 Declaration of Andres Payan, Jr.,
Att: 4 Declaration of Antonio Carpio,
Att: 5 Declaration of Anuar Contreras,
Att: 6 Declaration of Arnoldo Gonzalez Jr.,
Att: 7 Declaration of Clarissa Ashley Light,
Att: 8 Declaration of Mariceli Castro,
Att: 9 Declaration of Elizabeth Sanz
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/29 5:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance as co-counsel by Jeffrey Aaron Atteberry on behalf of Esperanza Gomez Escobar, Novedades Y Servicios, Inc. (Atteberry, Jeffrey)Attorney Jeffrey Aaron Atteberry added to party Esperanza Gomez Escobar(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey Aaron Atteberry added to party Novedades Y Servicios, Inc.(pty:pla)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/29 5:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance as co-counsel by Nilay U. Vora on behalf of Esperanza Gomez Escobar, Novedades Y Servicios, Inc. (Vora, Nilay)Attorney Nilay U. Vora added to party Esperanza Gomez Escobar(pty:pla), Attorney Nilay U. Vora added to party Novedades Y Servicios, Inc.(pty:pla)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
19 19 misc Transcript Mon 04/28 2:41 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 4/22/25, before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Court Reporter/Transcriber Stephanie Whitehead. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 5/19/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/29/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2025. (aas)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Lodgment Fri 04/25 4:04 PM
NOTICE of Lodgment by Scott Bessent, Pam Bondi, Financial Crimes Enforcement Network, Andrea Gacki, U.S. Department of the Treasury Public Administrative Record(Parker, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certification and Index,
Att: 2 Exhibit Pages 001-167,
Att: 3 Exhibit Pages 168-224,
Att: 4 Exhibit Pages 225-264,
Att: 5 Exhibit Pages 265-304,
Att: 6 Exhibit Pages 305-420,
Att: 7 Exhibit Pages 421-443
Thursday, April 24, 2025
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/24 3:40 PM
NOTICE Regarding Administrative Record by Scott Bessent, Pam Bondi, Financial Crimes Enforcement Network, Andrea Gacki, U.S. Department of the Treasury (Parker, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
16 16 3 pgs order Order Tue 04/22 3:49 PM
ORDER Granting8 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/22/25.(aas)
Related: [-]
15 15 minutes Motion Hearing ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order on Motion for TRO Tue 04/22 12:20 PM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Janis L. Sammartino: Motion Hearing held on 4/22/2025 re8 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Novedades Y Servicios, Inc., Esperanza Gomez Escobar. Oral arguments held. The Court grants8 Motion for TRO. Written order to follow. The Administrative Record is due by 4/25/2025. Motion for Preliminary Injunction is due by 4/29/2025. Responses due by 5/6/2025 and Replies due by 5/9/2025. A Motion Hearing re Preliminary Injunction is set for 5/15/2025 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4D before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. (Court Reporter/ECR Stephanie Whitehead). (Plaintiff Attorney Robert Johnson, Elizabeth Sanz and Katrin Marquez).(Defendant Attorney AUSA Katherine Parker). (no document attached) (ag)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 19, 2025
14 14 respm Reply to Response to Motion Sat 04/19 4:31 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re8 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Esperanza Gomez Escobar, Novedades Y Servicios, Inc..(Sanz, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Second Declaration of Esperanza Gomez
Friday, April 18, 2025
13 13 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/18 3:55 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re8 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Scott Bessent, Pam Bondi, Financial Crimes Enforcement Network, Andrea Gacki, U.S. Department of the Treasury.(Parker, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Lodgment and Exhibits 1-3
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Fri 04/18 2:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Novedades Y Servicios, Inc., Esperanza Gomez Escobar. All Defendants served. (Sanz, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
11 11 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/17 1:34 PM
ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Setting Hearing re8 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Responses due by 4/18/2025, Replies due by 4/19/2025. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2025 09:30 AM before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/17/25.(aas)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order of Judge Transfer Thu 04/17 10:40 AM
MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Janis L. Sammartino for all further proceedings. The new case number is 25cv886 JLS-DDL.(no document attached) (aas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/16 6:36 PM
NOTICE of Intent to Oppose by Scott Bessent, Pam Bondi, Financial Crimes Enforcement Network, Andrea Gacki, U.S. Department of the Treasury re8 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Parker, Katherine)Attorney Katherine L. Parker added to party Scott Bessent(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine L. Parker added to party Pam Bondi(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine L. Parker added to party Financial Crimes Enforcement Network(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine L. Parker added to party Andrea Gacki(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine L. Parker added to party U.S. Department of the Treasury(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Temporary Restraining Order Wed 04/16 2:58 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Esperanza Gomez Escobar, Novedades Y Servicios, Inc..(Sanz, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration of Esperanza Gomez,
Att: 3 Declaration of Elizabeth Sanz
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
7 7 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/15 2:03 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-19800395.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Rowes, Jeffrey) (exs)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/15 1:11 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-19800042.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Marquez, Katrin) (exs)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/15 1:09 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-19800018.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Johnson, Robert) (exs)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 04/15 9:24 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axc1)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Tue 04/15 9:12 AM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Esperanza Gomez Escobar, Novedades Y Servicios, Inc.. No Parties With Financial Interest. (axc1)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/15 9:10 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Esperanza Gomez Escobar, Novedades Y Servicios, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (axc1)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/15 9:09 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19797074.), filed by Novedades Y Servicios, Inc., Esperanza Gomez Escobar. The new case number is 3:25-cv-886-AJB-DDL. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner are assigned to the case. (Sanz, Elizabeth)(axc1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet