Florida Northern District Court
Judge:Allen C Winsor
Referred: Martin A Fitzpatrick
Case #: 4:25-cv-00168
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 2:05 PM EDT
Defendant
UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff
Lanie Black
Represented By
WILLIAM JOHN PERRY
Interpleader Law Llc - Baton Rouge La
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
13 13 2 pgs service Summons Issued Mon 05/12 9:45 AM
Summons Issued as to AMANDA ANDERSON. (tss)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
12 12 2 pgs notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 05/09 11:59 AM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons directed to Third Party Defendant by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (FURMAN, WENDY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
11 11 3 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/07 1:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DANIELLE SHURE PLOSHNICK on behalf of UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (PLOSHNICK, DANIELLE)
Related: [-]
10 10 3 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 05/07 12:59 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent MUTUAL OF OMAHA INSURANCE COMPANY for UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.. (FURMAN, WENDY)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 04/28 1:27 PM
ANSWER to8 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, by LANIE BLACK. (PERRY, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A: Statement of Dolly Mehal
Friday, April 25, 2025
8 8 14 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Third Party Complaint Counterclaim Fri 04/25 12:09 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint and Defenses , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT AGAINST AMANDA ANDERSON, individually and as Administratrix of the Estate of Daniel R. Vakulick, , COUNTERCLAIM against LANIE BLACK by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (FURMAN, WENDY) Modified title on 4/25/2025 (baf).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 46 pgs Exhibit 1 - Policy,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit 2 - Enrollment Form
Monday, April 21, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 04/21 1:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by LANIE BLACK. UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY served on 4/17/2025, answer due 5/8/2025. (atm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
6 6 1 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/17 7:26 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by LANIE BLACK. UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY served on 4/15/2025, answer due 5/6/2025. (PERRY, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
5 5 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/15 2:41 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PERRY, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 04/15 2:32 PM
Summons Issued as to UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (kdm)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Docket Annotation Tue 04/15 2:26 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Counsel Is Advised By This Entry, That A Civil Cover Sheet Should Be Filed As A Separate Entry Using The Event Selection "Civil Cover Sheet" Which Is Found Under "Other Filings" Under "Other Documents". Please Re-File The Civil Cover Sheet. (kdm)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 04/15 12:11 PM
NOTICE of Request for Summons to United of Omaha Life Insurance Company by Lanie Black re1 Complaint (PERRY, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/15 12:07 PM
COMPLAINT against UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AFLNDC-9437598.), filed by Lanie Black. (PERRY, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet