Consolidated
Lead case: 3:25-md-03140

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:25-cv-00510
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Case in other court:Colorado, 1:25-cv-01020
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 2:05 PM EDT
Defendant
GREENSTONE LLC
Defendant
PFIZER INC
Defendant
PHARMACIA & UPJOHN CO LLC
Defendant
PHARMACIA LLC
Defendant
PRASCO LLC
Defendant
VIATRIS INC
Interested Party
JACOB WOODY
Plaintiff
TRINEDAD ANTHONY


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/15 5:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRADLEY A SCRIVEN on behalf of TRINEDAD ANTHONY (SCRIVEN, BRADLEY)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 04/15 10:32 AM
NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION. The above-styled case has been transferred to the Northern District of Florida, and you are listed as counsel or co-counsel of record. Non-Florida Bar members must seek pro hac vice admission. For this multidistrict litigation, please consult the modified admissions requirements described in Pretrial Order No. 4 (Case No. 3:25-md-3140, ECF No. 6). re19 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (Notice sent to Kathy Owen Brown, DLA Piper US LLP and Bradley A. Scriven, Daniels & Scriven P.C. via mail and email) (djb)
Related: [-]
19 19 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Tue 04/15 10:17 AM
Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:25-cv-01020. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/15 8:59 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-10) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from District of Colorado, 25-CV-01020-GPG-CYC, to Northern District of Florida, to become part of MDL No. 3140, by Clerk on 4/14/2025. (sphil, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
17 17 MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court on its review of the Joint Stipulation and Motion Requesting an Extension and Continuance, ECF No.16 , in which the parties stipulate to extend certain deadlines and also ask the Court to reset the April 30, 2025 Status Conference to a date on or after May 19, 2025. The parties are reminded that if they would like to request relief from the Court by filing a motion, they must select the appropriate document type when filing the motion. In this case, the document in question was filed as a stipulation, not a motion. However, to the extent the Joint Stipulation and Motion Requesting an Extension and Continuance, ECF No.16 , asks the Court to reset the Status Conference, it is GRANTED. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the April 30, 2025 Status Conference is RESET on June 3, 2025 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung. Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 4/9/2025. (dgumb, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
16 16 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint and Joint Motion Requesting a Continuance by Defendants Pharmacia & Upjohn Co, LLC, Pharmacia LLC, Pfizer Inc., Greenstone LLC, Prasco, LLC, Viatris Inc.. All Defendants.(Brown, Kathy) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Thursday, April 03, 2025
15 15 MINUTE ORDER: The above-captioned case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung pursuant to an Order of Reference entered by District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on April 3, 2025. ECF No. 13 . Status Conference set for 4/30/2025 11:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung. It is ORDERED that the removing Defendants shall notify all Parties who have not entered an appearance of the date and time of the scheduling conference . Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 4/3/2025. (dgumb, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
14 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bradley A. Scriven on behalf of Trinedad AnthonyAttorney Bradley A. Scriven added to party Trinedad Anthony(pty:pla) (Scriven, Bradley) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other specifically-referred motions, and (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. by District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 3/31/2025. Text Only Entry (sphil, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
12 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Pfizer Inc. for Pharmacia LLC. (Brown, Kathy) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
11 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Pfizer Inc. for Pharmacia & Upjohn Co, LLC. (Brown, Kathy) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
10 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Pfizer Inc. for Pfizer Inc.. (Brown, Kathy) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
9 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (echa, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
8 8 Case assigned to District Judge Gordon P Gallagher and drawn to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung. Text Only Entry. (echa, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
7 7 Service of Process of Summons, Cover Sheet, Complaint upon Pfizer Inc. on 03/11/2025. (echa, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
6 6 Service of Process of Summons, Cover Sheet, Complaint upon Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC on 03/11/2025. (echa, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
5 5 Service of Process of Summons, Cover Sheet, Complaint upon Pharmacia LLC on 03/27/2025. (echa, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
4 4 COMPLAINT against Greenstone LLC, Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Co, LLC, Pharmacia LLC, Prasco, LLC, Viatris Inc., filed by Trinedad Anthony.(echa, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
3 3 ADMINISTRATIVE REMINDER to Filer. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1 and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a when filing a Notice of Removal. (Text only entry.) (echa, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
2 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (echa, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pharmacia & Upjohn Co, LLC, Pharmacia LLC, Pfizer Inc. from District Court, Denver County, Case Number 2025CV30885. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-10244672), filed by Pharmacia & Upjohn Co, LLC, Pharmacia LLC, Pfizer Inc..(Brown, Kathy) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/15/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Civil Cover Sheet