Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Angel Kelley
Case #: 1:25-cv-10954
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 2:06 PM EDT
Defendant
MARK GREGSON
Defendant
PEGGY GREGSON
Defendant
SIGMM LLC
Plaintiff
SONESTA RL HOTELS FRANCHISING INC.
Represented By
Gillian Wener
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
10 10 order Order Thu 05/08 2:10 PM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re9 Stipulation filed by Peggy Gregson, SIGMM LLC, Mark Gregson. The parties' stipulation requesting an extension of time to file a responsive pleading is APPROVED . Defendants shall file a responsive pleading no later than May 30, 2025. Additionally, any future requests for extension of time shall be filed in the form of a motion. (MAL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
9 9 misc Stipulation Wed 05/07 9:33 AM
STIPULATION To Extend Time to Respond to Sonesta RL Hotels Franchising Inc.'s Complaint by Mark Gregson, Peggy Gregson, SIGMM LLC. (Loeb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 04/21 10:18 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Peggy Gregson served on 4/16/2025, answer due 5/7/2025. (Wener, Gillian)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 04/21 10:16 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Mark Gregson served on 4/16/2025, answer due 5/7/2025. (Wener, Gillian)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 04/21 10:15 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed SIGMM LLC served on 4/16/2025, answer due 5/7/2025. (Wener, Gillian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 04/15 5:41 PM
Summons Issued as to Mark Gregson, Peggy Gregson, SIGMM LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (CM)
Related: [-]
4 4 4 pgs order Order Tue 04/15 4:21 PM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ORDER entered. Standing Order Regarding Motion Practice. (CEH)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 04/15 4:13 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Angel Kelley assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (JAM)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/15 2:09 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SONESTA RL HOTELS FRANCHISING INC. identifying Corporate Parent Red Lion Hotels Corporation, Other Affiliate Sonesta Holdco Corporation, Other Affiliate Sonesta International Hotels Corporation for SONESTA RL HOTELS FRANCHISING INC... (Wener, Gillian)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/15 2:01 PM
COMPLAINT against MARK GREGSON, PEGGY GREGSON, SIGMM LLC Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10952874 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by SONESTA RL HOTELS FRANCHISING INC..(Wener, Gillian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Franchise Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - First Amendment,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Promissory Note,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Second Amendment,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Restated Note,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Termination Letter,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Second Demand Letter,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Third Demand Letter,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 10 Category Form