New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jennifer H Rearden
Case #: 1:25-cv-03119
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2003 Job Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 2:04 PM EDT
Defendant
The Levy Group, Inc.
Plaintiff
Theadora Drakas
Represented By
Valdi Licul
Wigdor LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 04/21 5:22 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. The Levy Group, Inc. waiver sent on 4/15/2025, answer due 6/16/2025. Document filed by Theadora Drakas..(Licul, Valdi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 04/17 3:31 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Levy Group, Inc.. (vf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 04/16 12:54 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Levy Group, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Theadora Drakas..(Licul, Valdi)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 04/16 11:38 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 04/16 11:39 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 04/16 11:40 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 04/16 11:42 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Valdi Licul to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Defendant as to whom the summons request is for must listed first in the 'To' section of the PDf. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/15 2:38 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kassandra Vazquez on behalf of Theadora Drakas..(Vazquez, Kassandra)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/15 1:44 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Levy Group, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Theadora Drakas..(Licul, Valdi)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/15 1:43 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Licul, Valdi)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/15 1:27 PM
COMPLAINT against The Levy Group, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30934091)Document filed by Theadora Drakas..(Licul, Valdi)
Related: [-]