Alabama Middle District Court
Judge:Emily C Marks
Referred: Kelly F Pate
Case #: 2:25-cv-00287
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 2:06 PM CDT
Defendant
Mavis Tire Supply LLC
Plaintiff
Trevor Samuel Howard
1017 Hunters Mountain Parkway
Troy, AL 36079


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 05/13 9:58 AM
ORDERED that the Court's April 16, 2025 Order referring this case to the United States Magistrate Judge (doc. 5 ) is VACATED. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 5/13/2025. (CWL)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice to Counsel Tue 05/13 7:33 AM
NOTICE to Counsel - Service Material (CWL)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order Tue 05/13 7:30 AM
ORDERED that the STAY of service of process is LIFTED. Plaintiff, now a represented party, is obligated to effectuate service pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate on 5/13/2025. (CWL)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
8 8 cmp Complaint, Amended Fri 05/09 9:33 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mavis Tire Supply LLC, filed by Trevor Samuel Howard. (Payne, Jacob)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Tue 05/13 9:59 AM
***Attorney Talmadge Butts for Trevor Samuel Howard added. (CWL)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
7 7 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 04/25 10:42 AM
ORDER: Plf is ORDERED to file an Amended Complaint on or before May 9, 2025, that complies with the FRCP and the following requirements of this Order, as further set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate on 4/25/2025. (BES)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/21 12:43 PM
ORDERED that the 3 motion is GRANTED; The Clerk of Court is directed to STAY service of process so the Court may conduct its obligatory review of Plaintiff's Complaint under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate on 4/21/2025. (AM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 04/16 9:38 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636, to the United States Magistrate Judge for all pretrial proceedings and entry of any orders or recommendations as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 4/16/2025. (CWL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
4 4 misc Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement Tue 04/15 1:16 PM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Trevor Samuel Howard. (CWL)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/15 1:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Trevor Samuel Howard.(CWL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application to Proceed
2 2 service Proposed Summons Tue 04/15 1:13 PM
Proposed Summons (CWL)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/15 1:12 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Mavis Tire Supply LLC, filed by Trevor Samuel Howard.(CWL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet