Texas Western District Court
Judge:David Briones
Case #: 3:25-cv-00124
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 2:08 PM CDT
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff
Jack A Duncan, Jr.
Represented By
Selina Renae Valdez
Marc Whitehead & Associates, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Thu 05/08 3:57 PM
ORDER granting parties Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant, Life Insurance Company of North America to file answer, due to the Court by 6/12/2025.Signed by Judge David Briones. (em)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
5 5 misc Stipulation Wed 05/07 3:57 PM
STIPULATION (Joint) for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Butler, S.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 04/15 5:26 PM
Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (em)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Tue 04/15 2:06 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Jack A Duncan, Jr.. (Valdez, Selina)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/15 2:03 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jack A Duncan, Jr.. (Valdez, Selina)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/15 1:59 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-20047254), filed by Jack A Duncan, Jr..(Valdez, Selina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/15 5:24 PM
Case assigned to Judge David Briones. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (em)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to EP Mag Judge Tue 04/15 5:25 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Torres (em)
Related: [-]