American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company v. Dirt Cheap, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jesus G Bernal |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 5:25-cv-00916 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2025 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 1:06 PM PDT |
Movant
American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Dirt Cheap, Inc. dba DCG Fulfillment
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, May 16, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) |
|
Tuesday, May 06, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Resolution of the Underlying Case or in the Alternative Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Dirt Cheap, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/9/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Gauntlett, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David A. Gauntlett on behalf of Defendant Dirt Cheap, Inc. (Attorney David A. Gauntlett added to party Dirt Cheap, Inc. (pty:dft))(Gauntlett, David) |
|
Friday, April 18, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final4 . The following error(s) was/were found: Wrong event and form used, the correct event is "Notice">"Notice of Lodging" and the correct form CV 11D form has to be attached. Please refer to General Order 18-11. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn) |
|
Thursday, April 17, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Dirt Cheap, Inc. (car) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (car) |
|
Wednesday, April 16, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance7 , Notice of Appearance6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G-123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) |
|
Tuesday, April 15, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Withdrawal of Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final4 filed by Plaintiff American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company. (Schultz, Wendy) |
|
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ray Tamaddon on behalf of Movant American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company (Attorney Ray Tamaddon added to party American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company(pty:bkmov))(Tamaddon, Ray) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Debra R Puebla on behalf of Movant American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company (Attorney Debra R Puebla added to party American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company(pty:bkmov))(Puebla, Debra) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company, (Schultz, Wendy) |
|
4 | 4
![]() STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Schultz, Wendy) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company. (Schultz, Wendy) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company. (Schultz, Wendy) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39509421 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company. (Attorney Wendy E Schultz added to party American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company(pty:bkmov))(Schultz, Wendy) |