Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Gregory A Presnell
Referred: Robert M Norway
Case #: 6:25-cv-00660
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 5:07 PM EDT
Defendant
7 ACE LOGISTICS, LLC
Plaintiff
ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY as subrogee of QUALITY ONE WIRELESS, LLC
Represented By
Nicholas E. Pantelopoulos
Kma Zuckert LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
11 11 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 05/06 12:14 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Nicholas E. Pantelopoulos of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MLB)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
10 10 service Summons returned executed Mon 05/05 2:42 PM
RETURN of service executed on 4/22/2025 by Zurich American Insurance Company as to 7 Ace Logistics, LLC. (Pantelopoulos, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Proof of service Mon 05/05 12:07 PM
***INCORRECT EVENT. COUNSEL TO REFILE AS "SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED"*** PROOF of service by Zurich American Insurance Company (Pantelopoulos, Nicholas) Modified on 5/5/2025 (LSS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
8 8 service Proof of service Wed 04/23 4:44 PM
PROOF of service by Zurich American Insurance Company (Pantelopoulos, Nicholas) Modified text on 4/24/2025 (KME)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of lis pendens Mon 04/21 4:49 PM
NOTICE of lis pendens by Zurich American Insurance Company (Pantelopoulos, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Mon 04/21 4:47 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Zurich American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd. for Zurich American Insurance Company.. (Pantelopoulos, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
5 5 service Summons issued Wed 04/16 10:44 AM
SUMMONS issued as to 7 Ace Logistics, LLC. (JDR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
4 4 order Interested Persons Order Tue 04/15 5:05 PM
INITIAL CASE ORDER - Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement and notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/15/2025. (AKC)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/15 4:22 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:25-cv-660-GAP-RMN. (RPB)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Proposed summons Tue 04/15 4:02 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY as subrogee of QUALITY ONE WIRELESS, LLC. (Pantelopoulos, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/15 3:57 PM
COMPLAINT against 7 ACE LOGISTICS, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-23249600) filed by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY as subrogee of QUALITY ONE WIRELESS, LLC.(Pantelopoulos, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Subrogation Receipt,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit B - Invoice Dated 08/06/2024,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Written Notice of Claim,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet