Washington Western District Court
Judge:Richard A Jones
Case #: 2:25-cv-00678
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Case in other court:King County Superior Court, 25-00002-08628-3 SEA
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 2:08 PM PDT
Defendant
Globus Medical North America Inc
Represented By
Megan Maria Coluccio
Baker Sterchi Cowden & Rice LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Kaiser
Represented By
Lisa A Burke
Mbe Law Group PLLC
contact info
David C Martin
Mbe Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
13 13 order RAJ Order Setting Trial Date & Related Dates (FORM) Wed 05/14 9:51 AM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: 4 days. JURY TRIAL is set for 5/18/2026 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A. Jones. Joinder of Parties due by 8/14/2025, Amended Pleadings due by 11/19/2025, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 11/19/2025, Discovery Motions due by 12/16/2025, Discovery completed by 1/20/2026, Dispositive motions and motions challenging expert witness testimony due by 2/17/2026, Motions in Limine due by 4/20/2026, Pretrial Order due by 5/4/2026, Trial briefs, proposed jury instructions, proposed voir dire, agreed neutral statement of the case, deposition designations, and trial exhibits to be submitted by 5/11/2026. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
Related: [-]
notice Notice-Other Wed 05/14 9:53 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES: The Court acknowledges the statement in the12 Joint Status Report regarding Defendant's dispute that Plaintiff is entitled to a jury trial. Although the Court has set this matter for a jury trial, it is not making a formal determination on this issue. Any relief sought regarding the propriety of the jury demand must be made by way of formal written motion pursuant to LCR 7. (VE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
12 12 misc Joint Status Report Tue 05/13 12:03 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 4. (Burke, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/22 3:38 PM
ANSWER to Complaint; by Globus Medical North America Inc.(Coluccio, Megan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
10 10 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/21 2:40 PM
ORDER re9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Benjamin K. Jacobs for Defendant Globus Medical North America Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (HH)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/21 10:46 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Benjamin K. Jacobs FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Globus Medical North America Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8938134 (Coluccio, Megan)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/21 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert Leslie Christie on behalf of Defendant Globus Medical North America Inc. (Christie, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
7 7 misc Jury Demand Wed 04/16 10:39 AM
DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Michael Kaiser (Burke, Lisa)
Related: [-]
6 6 order RAJ Joint Status Report Order (FORM) Wed 04/16 9:39 AM
ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 4/30/2025, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/7/2025, Joint Status Report due by 5/14/2025. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc RAJ Standing Order (FORM) Wed 04/16 9:38 AM
STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Wed 04/16 8:58 AM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (HH)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 04/16 8:53 AM
Judge Richard A. Jones added. (HH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
3 3 misc Verification of State Court Records Tue 04/15 2:26 PM
VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Globus Medical North America Inc(Coluccio, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
2 2 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 04/15 2:04 PM
CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Globus Medical North America, LLC. (Coluccio, Megan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 04/15 1:54 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 25 2-08628 3; Related [+] Attorney Megan Maria Coluccio added to party Globus Medical North America, LLC(pty:dft) filed by Globus Medical North America, LLC.(Coluccio, Megan)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8931042
Att: 1 Ex. A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Ex. B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet