In Re: Pine Bluff Sand and Gravel Company
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James M Moody Jr |
Case #: | 4:25-cv-00364 |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Cause | 46:688 Maritime Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2025 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 5:04 PM CDT |
Plaintiff
Pine Bluff Sand and Gravel Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 25 minutes ago |
Thursday, May 15, 2025 | ||
misc
Docket Note
Thu 05/15 4:40 PM
Docket Note: The amount of $250.00 was received from Pine Bluff Sand and Gravel Company and deposited into the registry of the Court pursuant to7 Order. (cmn) |
||
Monday, May 12, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE OF ACTION BROUGHT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 05/12/2025. (llg) |
|
8 | 8
![]() ORDER RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS, DIRECTING ISSUANCE AND PUBLICATION OF NOTICE, AND APPROVING SECURITY. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/12/2025. (ldb) |
|
7 | 7
![]() ORDER GRANTING2 MOTION FOR DEPOSIT OF COSTS. Complainant shall deposit $250.00 into the Registry of the Court as security for costs in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/12/2025. (ajj) |
|
Saturday, April 19, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Pine Bluff Sand and Gravel Company (Bridgforth, William) |
|
5 | 5
![]() BRIEF IN SUPPORT re2 Motion to Deposit Funds filed by Pine Bluff Sand and Gravel Company. (Bridgforth, William) |
|
Thursday, April 17, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() BRIEF IN SUPPORT re3 Motion for Order filed by Pine Bluff Sand and Gravel Company. (Bridgforth, William) |
|
3 | 3
![]() MOTION for Order Restraining Prosecution of Claims, Notice of Action to Claimants and for Publication of Notice and for Acceptance and Approval of Security by Pine Bluff Sand and Gravel Company (Bridgforth, William) |
|
Tuesday, April 15, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() MOTION for Deposit of Costs by Pine Bluff Sand and Gravel Company. (ajj) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability filed by Pine Bluff Sand and Gravel Company. No summons issued. (Fee of $405 paid. Receipt Number LIT10265.) (ajj) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |