Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Catherine Peek Mcewen
Case #: 8:25-bk-02373
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Prime Tomahawk, LLC
2520 N McMullen Booth Rd Ste B419
Clearwater, FL 33761-4181
Represented By
Mark S Roher
Law Office Of Mark S. Roher, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602


Docket last updated: 30 minutes ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (BK) Fri 04/25 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 04/24/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #14 )
16 16 notice Notice of Additional Creditors Re: Purchase of Tax Liens Thu 04/24 10:24 AM
Notice of Additional Creditors Re: Purchase of Tax Liens - Broward County Real Estate Tax Deed Applicant Filed by Scott Andron on behalf of Creditor Broward County Tax Collector. (Andron, Scott)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 04/24 10:09 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Scott Andron on behalf of Creditor Broward County Tax Collector. (Andron, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
14 14 court Notice of Hearing / Status Conference / Reaffirmation Hearing Tue 04/22 2:38 PM
Notice of Initial Status Conference . Hearing scheduled for 6/5/2025 at 02:30 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . (Robert)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 20, 2025
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Mon 04/21 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Related [+]. Notice Date 04/20/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #8 )
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Mon 04/21 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Related [+]. Notice Date 04/20/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #7 )
Saturday, April 19, 2025
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sun 04/20 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #6 )
Friday, April 18, 2025
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 04/19 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/18/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #5 )
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 04/19 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/18/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #3 )
8 8 court Notice of Deficient Filing (BK) Fri 04/18 12:42 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Summary of Assets, Schedules A-J, Statement of Financial Affairs, Statement of Current Monthly Income, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney, Case Management Summary, and Certificate or resolution authorizing debtor to file Bankruptcy Petition . (Dana B.)
Related: [-]
7 7 court Notice of Deficient Filing (BK) Fri 04/18 12:37 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Summary of Assets, Schedules A-J, Statement of Financial Affairs, Statement of Current Monthly Income, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney, Case Management Summary, and Certificate or resolution authorizing debtor to file Bankruptcy Petition . (Dana B.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
6 6 court 341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline Thu 04/17 11:27 AM
Notice of Bankruptcy Case . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/14/2025 at 03:00 PM. U.S. Trustee (T/FM) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 866-910-0293. Passcode: 7560574. Proofs of Claims due by 6/24/2025. (Penny)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
5 5 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 04/16 1:39 PM
Order Prescribing Consequences of Failure to File Operating Reports and Pay Quarterly Fees Timely . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Deborah K.)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance on behalf of United States Trustee (Attorneys for U.S. Trustee Only) Wed 04/16 10:39 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Nicole Peair on behalf of U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - TPA. (Peair, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
3 3 2 pgs order Order Authorizing DIP to Operate Business Tue 04/15 11:58 PM
Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Tue 04/15 8:44 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Mark S Roher on behalf of Debtor Prime Tomahawk, LLC. (Roher, Mark)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 04/15 8:26 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Mark S Roher on behalf of Prime Tomahawk, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/13/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 08/13/2025. (Roher, Mark)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Tue 04/15 8:40 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:8:25-bk-02373] ) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A79277161, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court ADI - Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry) Tue 04/15 9:00 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]