Florida Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Karen K Specie
Case #: 3:25-bk-30329
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 08, 2025

Debtor
Horizon Improvements Inc.
1257 W Nine Mile Rd
Pensacola, FL 32534-1668
Represented By
Karin A. Garvin
Karin A. Garvin, P.L.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Theresa M. Bender
P.O. Box 14557
Tallahassee, FL 32317
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
110 E. Park Avenue Suite 128
Tallahassee, FL 32301


Docket last updated: 04/16/2025 12:02 AM EDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 04/15 3:32 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (Filing Fee: $338.00) filed by Horizon Improvements Inc.. (Garvin, Karin A.)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Online Payment Tue 04/15 3:44 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 25-30329 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) filing fee. Receipt number A5512595, amount $ 338.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
3 3 court AJTA - Ch 7 Business Tue 04/15 11:48 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors and Appointment of Trustee Theresa Bender with 341(a) Meeting of Creditors to be held on 5/8/2025 at 10:50 AM at Zoom - Bender: Meeting ID 332 456 9217, Passcode 7942049339, Phone 1 850 888 7651. (ajta)
Related: [-]