Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Mary S Scriven
Referred: Thomas G Wilson
Case #: 8:25-cv-00949
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 16, 2025 1:59 AM EDT
Defendant
Gulf Coast Collection Bureau, Inc.
Plaintiff
Sandra Jackson
Represented By
Cortney Walters
The Law Office Of Cortney E Walters, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, April 18, 2025
4 4 service Summons issued Fri 04/18 9:52 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Gulf Coast Collection Bureau, Inc.. (JDR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 04/17 10:35 AM
NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BCH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program Fri 04/18 10:16 AM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (KMN)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Standing Order Fri 04/18 10:14 AM
STANDING ORDER regarding Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 4/16/2025. (KMN)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/16 1:00 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:25-cv-00949-MSS-TGW. (AA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/15 10:20 PM
COMPLAINT against Gulf Coast Collection Bureau, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-23250766) filed by Sandra Jackson.(Walters, Cortney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet