California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Barry Russell
Case #: 2:25-bk-13112
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
1808 MAGINN DR, LLC
1146 N Central Ave PMB 340
Glendale, CA 91202-2506
Represented By
Onyinye N Anyama
Anyama Law Firm, A Professional Corp
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
21 21 misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) Wed 04/30 8:36 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) , List of Equity Security Holders , Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) , Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) , Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule D Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule E/F Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) , Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) Filed by Debtor 1808 MAGINN DR, LLC Related [+]. (Anyama, Onyinye)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
20 20 court Process Paid Request for Certified Copy Wed 04/30 8:01 PM
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Request for a Certified Copy Wed 04/30 6:28 PM
Request for a Certified Copy Fee Amount $12. The document will be sent via email to :Karina.ruiz@anyamalaw.com: Filed by Debtor 1808 MAGINN DR, LLC Related [+]. (Anyama, Onyinye)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 04/30 6:30 PM
Receipt of Request for a Certified Copy([LINK:2:25-bk-13112-BR] ) [misc,paycert] ( 12.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58361118. Fee amount 12.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc# 19
Monday, April 28, 2025
18 18 misc Corp Resolution Auth Filing Mon 04/28 10:46 PM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor 1808 MAGINN DR, LLC. (Anyama, Onyinye)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Addendum to Vol Pet Mon 04/28 10:45 PM
Addendum to voluntary petition Filed by Debtor 1808 MAGINN DR, LLC. (Anyama, Onyinye)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 04/18 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/18/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order setting initial status conference in chapter 11 case (BNC-PDF)
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 04/18 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/18/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC)
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 04/18 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/18/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor 1808 MAGINN DR, LLC
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 04/18 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 04/18/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1)
Thursday, April 17, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 04/17 8:22 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:2:25-bk-13112] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58300483. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
12 12 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1) Wed 04/16 3:30 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/19/2025 at 09:00 AM at UST-LA2, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-816-0394, PARTICIPANT CODE:5282999. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/18/2025. (LL2)
Related: [-]
11 11 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Wed 04/16 3:09 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other - Proof of service required. Related [+] (SM)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Creditor Toorak Capital Partners, LLC
10 10 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Wed 04/16 2:12 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other - Proof of service required. Related [+] (SM)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Creditor Toorak Capital Partners, LLC,8 Notice of Appearance filed by Creditor Toorak Capital Partners, LLC
9 9 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 04/16 1:51 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Allison C. Murray Filed by Creditor Toorak Capital Partners, LLC. (Murray, Allison)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 04/16 1:44 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Andrew Still Filed by Creditor Toorak Capital Partners, LLC. (Still, Andrew)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 04/16 1:41 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Eric S Pezold Filed by Creditor Toorak Capital Partners, LLC. (Pezold, Eric)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Hearing Set (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option) Wed 04/16 10:37 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 6/24/2025 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1668, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Barry Russell (SF)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor 1808 MAGINN DR, LLC
5 5 6 pgs order Order setting initial status conference in chapter 11 case (BNC-PDF) Wed 04/16 10:01 AM
Order setting initial status conference in chapter 11 case (BNC-PDF) Signed on 4/16/2025 Related [+]. Status hearing to be held on 6/24/2025 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1668, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Barry Russell (SF)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor 1808 MAGINN DR, LLC
4 4 misc Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (manual - ccdn) (BNC) Wed 04/16 9:16 AM
Case Commencement Deficiency Notice to include deficiency re: Disclosure of Compensation of Atty for Debtor (Official Form 2030) and Statement of Related Cases (BNC) Related [+] (LL)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor 1808 MAGINN DR, LLC
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
3 3 misc Corp Resolution Auth Filing Tue 04/15 11:25 PM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor 1808 MAGINN DR, LLC. (Anyama, Onyinye)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 04/15 11:23 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Debtor 1808 MAGINN DR, LLC. (Anyama, Onyinye)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 04/15 11:19 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by 1808 MAGINN DR, LLC Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 04/29/2025. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 04/29/2025. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 04/29/2025. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 04/29/2025. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 04/29/2025. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 04/29/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 04/29/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 04/29/2025. (Anyama, Onyinye)
Related: [-]
misc Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) Wed 04/16 9:09 AM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) Related [+] Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 4/29/2025. (LL)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor 1808 MAGINN DR, LLC