New York Southern District Court
Judge:Edgardo Ramos
Case #: 1:25-mc-00166
CauseM 98 Miscellaneous Application to File Civil Case Under Seal
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Terminated:Apr 17, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 17, 2025
4 4 order Order Thu 04/17 5:29 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES*** ORDER: The Clerk is directed to restrict access to this order to the selected party viewing level and close this case. SO ORDERED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/17/2025) (ar)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Leave to File Case Under Seal Thu 04/17 12:54 PM
***EX-PARTE*** MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Leave to File Case Under Seal .Document filed by ABC.(Lichtman, Leo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to File Case Under Seal,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order to File Civil Case Under Seal,
Att: 3 Errata Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit Complaint Ex. A,
Att: 5 Exhibit Complaint Ex. B,
Att: 6 Errata Memo in Support of TRO, Expedited Discovery Order, and OTSC for PI,
Att: 7 Errata Declaration of Yesenia Hipolito,
Att: 8 Exhibit Declaration of Yesenia Hipolito, Ex. A,
Att: 9 Exhibit Declaration of Yesenia Hipolito, Ex. B,
Att: 10 Errata Declaration of Leo M. Lichtman,
Att: 11 Exhibit Declaration of Leo M. Lichtman, Ex. A,
Att: 12 Exhibit Declaration of Leo M. Lichtman, Ex. B,
Att: 13 Errata Declaration of Ryan Rabenold,
Att: 14 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Show Cause,
Att: 15 Errata Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages,
Att: 16 Proposed Order Proposed Order to File Excess Pages,
Att: 17 Errata Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement,
Att: 18 Errata Form AO 120 - patent,
Att: 19 Errata Form AO 120 - trademark,
Att: 20 Errata Form AO 121 - copyrights,
Att: 21 Civil Cover Sheet Unredacted Misc. Cover Sheet,
Att: 22 Civil Cover Sheet Unredacted Civil Cover Sheet
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Thu 04/17 3:26 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Leo Martin Lichtman to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading; the document should be filed as a miscellaneous motion for leave to file case under seal. (laq)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 04/17 3:26 PM
Case Designated ECF. (laq)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Motion for Leave to File Case Under Seal Thu 04/17 3:28 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CASE UNDER SEAL. Document No. 3 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Leave to File Case Under Seal was reviewed and approved as to form. (laq)
Related: [-]
notice Miscellaneous Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 04/17 3:29 PM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. This is a Part I Term Assignment matter. (laq)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
2 2 misc Miscellaneous Cover Sheet Wed 04/16 3:57 PM
MISCELLANEOUS COVER SHEET filed..(Lichtman, Leo)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/16 3:52 PM
COMPLAINT against DEF. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30941139)Document filed by ABC..(Lichtman, Leo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to File Case Under Seal,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order to File Civil Case Under Seal,
Att: 3 Errata Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit Complaint Ex. A,
Att: 5 Exhibit Complaint Ex. B,
Att: 6 Errata Memo in Support of TRO, Expedited Discovery Order, and OTSC for PI,
Att: 7 Errata Declaration of Yesenia Hipolito,
Att: 8 Exhibit Declaration of Yesenia Hipolito, Ex. A,
Att: 9 Exhibit Declaration of Yesenia Hipolito, Ex. B,
Att: 10 Errata Declaration of Leo M. Lichtman,
Att: 11 Exhibit Declaration of Leo M. Lichtman, Ex. A,
Att: 12 Exhibit Declaration of Leo M. Lichtman, Ex. B,
Att: 13 Errata Declaration of Ryan Rabenold,
Att: 14 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Show Cause,
Att: 15 Errata Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages,
Att: 16 Proposed Order Proposed Order to File Excess Pages,
Att: 17 Errata Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement,
Att: 18 Errata Form AO 120 - patent,
Att: 19 Errata Form AO 120 - trademark,
Att: 20 Errata Form AO 121 - copyrights,
Att: 21 Civil Cover Sheet Unredacted Misc. Cover Sheet,
Att: 22 Civil Cover Sheet Unredacted Civil Cover Sheet