California Northern District Court
Judge:Lisa J Cisneros
Case #: 4:25-cv-03370
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 16, 2025 10:07 AM PDT
Defendant
John Doe
Plaintiff
Andrew Gladwin
PO Box 11003
Fayetteville, AR 72704


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
4 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/2/2025. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/17 2:01 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Andrew Gladwin . (Rose, Adam)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Leave to File Document Thu 04/17 1:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Prior to Rule 26(f) filed by Andrew Gladwin.(Rose, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-4
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/17 12:56 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number BCANDC-20578622.). Filed by Andrew Gladwin.(Rose, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-4
utility Electronic Filing Error Thu 04/17 1:46 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. Use December 2024 which can be downloaded from https://cand.uscourts.gov/. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetPlease re-file in its entirety. Re:1 Complaint filed by Andrew Gladwin (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]