Sircy v. United States of America
Kentucky Western District Court | |
Judge: | Benjamin Beaton |
Referred: | Lanny King |
Case #: | 5:25-cv-00046 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2025 |
Terminated: | May 13, 2025 |
Case in other court: | Texas Southern, 4:24-cv-04680 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 16, 2025 2:08 PM EDT |
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Megan N. Sircy
510 Baylor Street
Austin, TX 78703 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 13, 2025 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 05/13 9:45 AM
TEXT ORDER: All parties have signed a filing indicating their agreement that this case should be dismissed. DN (27 ). Because the stipulation does not "stat[e] otherwise," this dismissal "is without prejudice." Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Accordingly, this action stands dismissed without prejudice and the Court strikes it from the active docket. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel (HMC) |
|
Monday, May 12, 2025 | ||
27 | 27
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal by Megan N. Sircy. (Guerrero, Marco) |
|
Thursday, May 08, 2025 | ||
26 | 26
![]() ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 05/07/2025 granting24 Motion for Marco Guerrero to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (HMC) |
|
Thursday, May 01, 2025 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order - TEXT ONLY
Thu 05/01 10:37 AM
TEXT ORDER: Under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A), the Court refers this matter to Magistrate Judge King for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge King may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (JM) |
|
Wednesday, April 30, 2025 | ||
24 | 24
![]() MOTION for Attorney Marco Guerrero to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 150. by Plaintiff Megan N. Sircy. (JM) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, April 16, 2025 | ||
23 | 23
![]() ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Mary Melissa Whittle re19 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 4/30/2025. (KJA) |
|
22 | 22
![]() ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Marco Kelly Guerrero re19 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 4/30/2025. (KJA) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Deficiency
Wed 04/16 1:16 PM
ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Myra Siddiqui re19 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: failure to register to file electronically pursuant to GO 2008-03. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 4/30/2025. (KJA) |
|
20 | 20
![]() Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to District Judge Benjamin Beaton. (KJA) |
|
19 | 19
![]() Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:24-cv-04680. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (KJA) |
|
Interdistrict transfer to Western District of Kentucky. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 04/16/2025, filed. (jww4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/16/2025.] | ||
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District
Wed 04/16 11:48 AM
Interdistrict transfer to Western District of Kentucky. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 04/16/2025, filed. (jww4) |
||
Tuesday, March 25, 2025 | ||
18 | 18
![]() |
|
Monday, March 24, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, March 19, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() |
|
15 | 15
![]() |
|
Thursday, March 06, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() |
|
Monday, March 03, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
![]() |
|
Friday, February 07, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() |
|
Thursday, January 30, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() |
|
Tuesday, January 28, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, January 16, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
Monday, December 30, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Thursday, December 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Monday, December 02, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Referral Judge Selected: Magistrate Judge Yvonne Y. Ho randomly selected to receive referrals. The selected Magistrate Judge is not assigned to this case until a District Judge refers the case or a motion or the parties consent to jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. Once a referral has been made, the name of the referral judge will appear at the top of the docket sheet. (hem4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/16/2025.] | ||
Wednesday, November 27, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Tuesday, November 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |