North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Richard E Myers, II
Referred: Brian S Meyers
Case #: 7:25-cv-00629
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1442 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 16, 2025 2:09 PM EDT
Defendant
Jewel Politte
Represented By
Katherine Blass Asaro
United States Attorney'S Office - Ednc
contact info
Plaintiff
John W. Davis, III


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 05/01 4:53 PM
ORDER granting 9 Motion to Stay. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 5/1/2025. Copy mailed to Plaintiffs counsel by US Mail. (Griffin, T)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
utility Motion Referred Wed 04/30 10:38 AM
Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers regarding9 Consent MOTION to Stay regarding7 Order for Discovery Plan . (Griffin, T)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
9 9 motion Stay Mon 04/28 9:34 AM
Consent MOTION to Stay regarding7 Order for Discovery Plan filed by United States of America. (Asaro, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, April 25, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order Fri 04/25 9:31 AM
ORDER regarding 2 Notice filed by Jewel Politte Certification of Scope of Employment and Substitution. Signed by Chief Judge Richard E. Myers, II on 4/24/2025. Copy mailed by US Mail to Plaintiff's counsel. (Griffin, T)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
7 7 1 pgs discov Order for Discovery Plan Tue 04/22 12:03 PM
ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/22/2025. Copy sent by US Mail to Plaintiff Counsel. (Griffin, T)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
6 6 6 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Mon 04/21 10:35 AM
Memorandum in Support regarding5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jewel Politte. (Asaro, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Stephanie M. Corbin
5 5 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 04/21 10:34 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jewel Politte. (Asaro, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
4 4 notice Notice-other Fri 04/18 3:55 PM
Notice regarding1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel, Franklin D. Pope of Law Offices of John Drew Warlick at 313 New Bridge Street, Jacksonville, NC 28540 mailed on April 18, 2025. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/16 12:11 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Katherine Blass Asaro on behalf of Jewel Politte. (Asaro, Katherine)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice-other Wed 04/16 12:10 PM
Notice filed by Jewel Politte Certification of Scope of Employment and Substitution . (Asaro, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Scope of Employment
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 04/16 12:04 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jewel Politte from Onslow County, case number 24CVS1374., filed by Jewel Politte. (Asaro, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint filed in Onslow County Superior Court,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Answer filed in Onslow County Superior Court,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Letter to Onslow County Clerk dated April 16, 2025