Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:25-bk-50055

Louisiana Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John W Kolwe
Case #: 4:25-ap-05007
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Natalie Sara Moss
101 E Jeff Davis Ave. Unit B
Rayne, LA 70578
Plaintiff
Maple Federal Credit Union
105 Toledo Dr
Lafayette, LA 70506
Represented By
Daniel M. Landry, III
contact info
Christian Landry
The Landry Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/23 9:48 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Shane M. Mouton on behalf of Natalie Sara Moss (Mouton, Shane)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 04/21 8:42 AM
Summons Service Executed on Natalie Sara Moss 4/17/2025 . (Landry, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/18 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/18/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 New Adversary Proceeding and Scheduling Order - AP
Thursday, April 17, 2025
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 04/17 9:00 AM
Summons Issued on Natalie Sara Moss Date Issued 4/17/2025 (melo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
2 2 order New Adversary Proceeding and Scheduling Order - AP Wed 04/16 9:43 AM
Scheduling Order Setting Deadlines and Trial Docket Call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date is set for 10/29/2025 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom Five, Lafayette. Filed on 4/16/2025 (melo)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
1 1 cmp Complaint (Fee) Wed 04/16 8:40 AM
Adversary case 25-05007 (65 (Dischargeability - other)): Complaint by Maple Federal Credit Union (attorneys Christian Landry, Daniel M. Landry III, Daniel M. Landry III) against Natalie Sara Moss. Fee Amount Due $350 (Landry, Daniel)
Related: [-]