Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Panayotta D Augustin-Bir
Case #: 0:25-cv-60734
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Case in other court:New York Southern, 1:25-cv-02307
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 16, 2025 3:05 PM EDT
Defendant
Broward County Office of Medical Examiner & Trauma
Defendant
Forest Lawn Funeral Home & Memorial Gardens
Plaintiff
Tiffany Anne Parkes
353 3rd Avenue #114
New York, NY 10010


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Compliance Wed 05/14 10:43 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re9 Order: Mailing to Plaintiff a copy of9 ORDER to the address listed in the Order. (caw)
Related: [-]
9 9 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 05/14 10:26 AM
ORDER GRANTING4 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, SCREENING COMPLAINT, AND ORDERING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint that complies with this Order within 21 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 5/13/2025. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
8 8 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 04/17 9:14 AM
ORDER Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction and Opt Out Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 4/17/2025. See attached document for full details. (sk01)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
7 7 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 04/16 2:47 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
Related: [-]
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE Wed 04/16 2:41 PM
Case transferred in from New York Southern; Case Number 1:25-cv-02307. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 5. Mailed to: Tiffany Anne Parkes 353 3rd Avenue #114 New York, NY 10010. (anc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
5 5 TRANSFER ORDER : The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/4/2025) (jjc) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
Related: [-]
CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Southern District of Florida (jjc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 2. Mailed to: Tiffany Anne Parkes 353 3rd Avenue #114 New York, NY 10010. (ne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
2 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE CASES FILED BY PRO SE PLAINTIFFS (See 24-MISC-127 Standing Order filed March 18, 2024). To ensure that all cases heard in the Southern District of New York are handled promptly and efficiently, all parties must keep the court apprised of any new contact information. It is a party's obligation to provide an address for service; service of court orders cannot be accomplished if a party does not update the court when a change of address occurs. Accordingly, all self-represented litigants are hereby ORDERED to inform the court of each change in their address or electronic contact information. Parties may[LINK:consent to electronic service] to receive notifications of court filings by email, rather than relying on regular mail delivery. Parties may also ask the court for[LINK:permission to file documents electronically] . Forms, including instructions for consenting to electronic service and requesting permission to file documents electronically, may be found by clicking on the hyperlinks in this order, or by accessing the forms on the courts website, nysd.uscourts.gov/forms. The procedures that follow apply only to cases filed by pro se plaintiffs. If the court receives notice from the United States Postal Service that an order has been returned to the court, or otherwise receives information that the address of record for a self-represented plaintiff is no longer valid, the court may issue an Order to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with this order. Such order will be sent to the plaintiffs last known address and will also be viewable on the court's electronic docket. A notice directing the parties' attention to this order shall be docketed (and mailed to any self-represented party that has appeared and has not consented to electronic service) upon the opening of each case or miscellaneous matter that is classified as pro se in the court's records. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/18/2024) (sac)
Related: [-]
CASE MANAGEMENT NOTE: For each electronic filing made in a case involving a self-represented party who has not consented to electronic service, the filing party must serve the document on such self-represented party in a manner permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2) (other than through the ECF system) and file proof of service for each document so served. Please see[LINK:Rule 9.2] of the courts ECF Rules & Instructions for further information. (sac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
4 4 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Tiffany Anne Parkes. (jjc)
Related: [-]
3 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (jjc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT against Broward County Office of Medical Examiner & Trauma, Forest Lawn Funeral Home & Memorial Gardens. Document filed by Tiffany Anne Parkes. (sac)
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF. (sac)
Related: [-]