Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Gretchen S Lund
Referred: Abizer Zanzi
Case #: 4:25-cv-00025
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilites Act
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 16, 2025 5:10 PM EDT
Defendant
Board of Trustees of Purdue University
Defendant
Neera Jain
Plaintiff
Michael Tabango
Represented By
Matthew A Smith
John H Haskin & Associates LLC
contact info
John H Haskin
John H Haskin & Associates LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
8 8 motion Sealed Motion Mon 05/12 4:32 PM
SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Michael Tabango.. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope
Thursday, May 08, 2025
7 7 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 05/08 4:41 PM
ORDER/SET HEARING re6 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Michael Tabango. The Court sets this matter for a Motion Hearing on 5/19/2025 09:30 AM CST in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi. Pla and Pla Counsel are ORDERED to appear IN-PERSON. Counsel for dft may appear telephonically by calling 833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 2255 6691; Push # to skip Participant ID; enter Passcode: 252788 when prompted. Pla Counsel is ORDERED to notify Plaintiff of the hearing. Text entry by Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi on 5/8/2025. (shk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
6 6 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 05/06 2:50 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Michael Tabango.(Smith, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, May 02, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/02 10:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John R Maley on behalf of All Defendants (Maley, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 04/18 11:23 AM
Summons Issued as to Board of Trustees of Purdue University, Neera Jain. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kmt)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 04/18 11:22 AM
**NEW CASE** Judge Gretchen S Lund and Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi added. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/16 2:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A Smith on behalf of Michael Tabango (Smith, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/16 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John H Haskin on behalf of Michael Tabango (Haskin, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/16 2:27 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5876961.), filed by Michael Tabango.(Haskin, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons