Alabama Middle District Court
Judge:R Austin Huffaker, Jr
Case #: 2:25-cv-00293
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 16, 2025 5:06 PM CDT
Defendant
Cresheva G. Singleton
Defendant
Felicia N. Smith
Plaintiff
Transamerican Financial Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Braden Travis Morell
Maynard Nexsen PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/05 4:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Transamerican Financial Life Insurance Company. Felicia N. Smith served on 4/26/2025, answer due 5/19/2025. (Morell, Braden)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Returned Green Card
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/05 4:49 PM
NOTICE by Transamerican Financial Life Insurance Company of Caption Correction (Morell, Braden)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Amended Civil Cover Sheet
9 9 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 05/05 9:40 AM
Case reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. as Presiding Judge and Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams as Referral Judge. Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams no longer assigned to the case as Presiding Judge. (BES)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/02 1:58 PM
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Felicia N. Smith.(TPS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/24 11:34 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Transamerican Financial Life Insurance Company. Cresheva G. Singleton served on 4/21/2025, answer due 5/12/2025. (Morell, Braden)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
6 6 misc Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement Fri 04/18 12:51 PM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Transamerican Financial Life Insurance Company re4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Morell, Braden)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 04/18 12:14 PM
Summons Issued as to Cresheva G. Singleton, Felicia N. Smith. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (AM)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement Fri 04/18 12:13 PM
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Transamerican Financial Life Insurance Company; Corporate Disclosures due by 4/28/2025.(AM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order and Sample Format
3 3 notice Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge Fri 04/18 12:10 PM
NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Form to Decline Consent to the U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Transamerican Financial Life Insurance Company.(AM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 General Order
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 04/18 11:57 AM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams. (NO PDF) (AM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/16 2:20 PM
COMPLAINT against Cresheva G. Singleton, Felicia N. Smith ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AALMDC-3844600.), filed by Transamerican Financial Life Insurance Company. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 7/15/2025. (Morell, Braden)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Application,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Certificate,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Death Certificate,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Benefit Change Form,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Power of Attorney Desgination,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Singleton Claim Form,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Smith Claim Form,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 9 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons - Felicia N. SmithN.,
Att: 10 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons - Cresheva G. Singleton