New Jersey District Court
Judge:Stanley R Chesler
Referred: Leda D Wettre
Case #: 2:25-cv-02785
Nature of Suit835 Property Rights - Patent – Abbreviated New Drug Application
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 16, 2025 6:08 PM EDT
Defendant
ALMAJECT, INC.
Defendant
ALVOGEN PB RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC
Defendant
ALVOGEN, INC.
Plaintiff
GENTIUM S.R.L.
Represented By
CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By
CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/13 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR on behalf of ALMAJECT, INC., ALVOGEN PB RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC, ALVOGEN, INC. (ESCANLAR, KATHERINE)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/13 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ARNOLD B. CALMANN on behalf of ALMAJECT, INC., ALVOGEN PB RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC, ALVOGEN, INC. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/02 4:44 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., GENTIUM S.R.L.. ALVOGEN, INC. waiver sent on 4/28/2025, answer due 6/27/2025. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/02 4:43 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., GENTIUM S.R.L.. ALVOGEN PB RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC waiver sent on 4/28/2025, answer due 6/27/2025. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/02 4:42 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., GENTIUM S.R.L.. ALMAJECT, INC. waiver sent on 4/28/2025, answer due 6/27/2025. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/25 9:59 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER LEE CALLO on behalf of All Plaintiffs (CALLO, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/25 9:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of All Plaintiffs (SULLIVAN, SARAH)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/25 9:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of GENTIUM S.R.L., JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (BATON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 04/17 11:55 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALMAJECT, INC., ALVOGEN PB RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC, ALVOGEN, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (and)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc AO120 Patent/Trademark Form Thu 04/17 11:54 AM
AO120 Patent Form filed. (and)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 04/17 8:39 AM
Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (jr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 04/16 5:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by GENTIUM S.R.L.. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 04/16 5:25 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
1 1 66 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/16 5:24 PM
COMPLAINT against ALMAJECT, INC., ALVOGEN PB RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC, ALVOGEN, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-16180000), filed by JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., GENTIUM S.R.L..(LIZZA, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet