Washington Western District Court
Judge:Thomas S Zilly
Case #: 2:25-cv-00691
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 16, 2025 6:08 PM PDT
Defendant
C'D Soil Counseling, PLLC d/b/a Seedsoil Family Counseling
Defendant
D.U.
Defendant
Brian Hall
Defendant
L.U.
Plaintiff
NASW RRG Insurance Company n/k/a Preferra Insurance Company Risk Retention Group
Represented By
Eliot M Harris
Williams Kastner (sea)
contact info
Jennifer E Aragon
Williams, Kastner & Gibbs Pllc (sea)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Unavailability Wed 05/21 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel David Stanley Marshall for Defendant Brian Hall from 5-29-25 to 6-16-25 and 8-13-25 to 8-26-25. (Marshall, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Related Case Tue 05/20 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) Sno Cty Sup Ct 25 2-02714 31, USDC No. 2:25-cv-00924-MLP, by Plaintiff NASW RRG Insurance Company. (Aragon, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/14 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David Stanley Marshall on behalf of Defendant Brian Hall. (Marshall, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
5 5 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Tue 05/06 9:47 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Thomas S. Zilly: Joint Status Report due by 7/7/2025, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/23/2025, and Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/7/2025. (RM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/17 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Eliot M Harris on behalf of Plaintiff NASW RRG Insurance Company. (Harris, Eliot)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Thu 04/17 11:48 AM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Complaint,. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s). See attached letter for more information and instructions. (HH)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 04/17 11:33 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants(HH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons DU,
Att: 2 Summons Brian Hall,
Att: 3 Summons C'D Soil Counseling PLLC
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 04/17 11:13 AM
Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (HH)
Related: [-]
utility Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines Thu 04/17 11:34 AM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Plaintiff(s) NASW RRG Insurance Company must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 4/24/2025. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(HH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/16 5:35 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants Related [+] Attorney Jennifer E Aragon added to party NASW RRG Insurance Company n/k/a Preferra Insurance Company Risk Retention Group(pty:pla) filed by NASW RRG Insurance Company n/k/a Preferra Insurance Company Risk Retention Group.(Aragon, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8933587
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons L.U.,
Att: 3 Summons D.U.,
Att: 4 Summons Brian Hall,
Att: 5 Summons C'D Soil Counseling