Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:David M Lawson
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 2:25-cv-11082
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Terminated:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 2:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Sharde Latrice Marshall
Defendant
Darrell Daizon Reed, Jr.
Defendant
Haly TriShelle Reed
Defendant
Shaneika Patrice Reed
Plaintiff
Europe Roshelle Colbert
12801 Couwlier Ave
Warren, MI 48089

GPO Apr 17 2025
OPINION and ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and SUMMARILY DISMISSING COMPLAINT Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (JHea)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
service Certificate of Service Thu 05/01 11:31 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re7 Order to Show Cause on Europe Roshelle Colbert at 12801 Couwlier Ave., Warren, MI 48089. (SPin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
7 7 order Show Cause Thu 05/01 11:29 AM
ORDER for Europe Roshelle Colbert to Show Cause Why Her Case Should Not be Dismissed for Want of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 5/14/2025. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
6 6 notice Correction Wed 04/23 2:57 PM
NOTICE of Correction re5 Opinion & Order. (JHea)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Thu 04/24 10:08 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re6 Notice of Correction on Europe Colbert at Europe Colbert 12801 Couwlier Ave Warren, MI 48089 (JHea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
5 5 3 pgs order Memorandum Opinion & Order Thu 04/17 3:44 PM
OPINION and ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and SUMMARILY DISMISSING COMPLAINT Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (JHea)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Thu 04/17 3:11 PM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (LGra)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Thu 04/17 4:34 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re5 Opinion & Order on Europe Roshelle Colbert at Europe Roshelle Colbert 12801 Couwlier Ave Warren, MI 48089 (JHea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
2 2 petition Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Wed 04/16 1:24 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Europe Roshelle Colbert. (JHea)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Wed 04/16 1:23 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Europe Roshelle Colbert against Sharde Latrice Marshall, Darrell Daizon Reed, Jr, Haly TriShelle Reed, Shaneika Patrice Reed (JHea)
Related: [-]