Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steven D Grimberg
Case #: 1:25-cv-01579
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 6:09 AM EDT
Defendant
ANGMAO3
Defendant
AOYH3EQ440YW9
Defendant
APEX FASHIONS
Defendant
ARTISTLIFEHAPPY
Defendant
AWINQQY
Defendant
AWOEH
Defendant
BAOJIANTU
Defendant
BOLISHANGMAO47
Defendant
BPGRPLYD
Defendant
CAT TEE
Defendant
CDJLYUS CO. LTD
Defendant
CHENQ
Defendant
CHO ONLINE
Defendant
COOEVERLY
Defendant
D0VETAIL
Defendant
DALANGDD
Defendant
DALIANPO POSTER
Defendant
DECALMILE
Defendant
DULOT
Defendant
DURRUD
Defendant
DUTASHOP-01
Defendant
ELE STORES
Defendant
ELIZABETHLYI
Defendant
EMAXTRONICS
Defendant
ERETHI TOYS CO., LTD
Defendant
FANDING
Defendant
FANDOUSHANGMAO
Defendant
FDC STYLE
Defendant
FEMBOY
Defendant
FENGDELINCHUHAIDIANPU
Defendant
FUHAO
Defendant
GCVVIC
Defendant
GOMIND
Defendant
GTSGYKK
Defendant
GUANER DECORATIVE
Defendant
GUANGZHOUANJINSHANGMAOYOUXIANGONGSI
Defendant
GUESS YOU LIKE
Defendant
HANMOTU
Represented By
Albert M. Myers
Albert M. Myers
contact info
Defendant
HATOKYO STORE
Defendant
HENGYANGXIANZHAOWANSHANGMAOYOUXIANGONG
Defendant
HOUXVDEXIAODIAN
Defendant
HR-TRADE
Defendant
HUANGGUOCANARTS
Defendant
IRON DAN
Represented By
Albert M. Myers
Albert M. Myers
contact info
Defendant
JCWANGLUO
Defendant
JIASEN
Defendant
JIESHENGWANGLUO
Defendant
JIEYISHOP
Defendant
JUJUQUE
Defendant
JUNLIANG CANVAS PAINTING
Defendant
KAIDUIDGJK SHOP
Defendant
KAMUJIE_OFFICAL
Defendant
KEIOLY
Defendant
KERRY-DOBER
Defendant
KESIYU
Defendant
KOMLLEX
Defendant
LGHTYRO
Defendant
LIUYISHANGMAO
Defendant
LIVEST
Defendant
LONGLONG
Represented By
Albert M. Myers
Albert M. Myers
contact info
Defendant
LUOSIKAI
Represented By
Albert M. Myers
Albert M. Myers
contact info
Defendant
LY NGO SHOP
Defendant
MAITHANGSTORE
Defendant
MANYUANPEISHANGMAO
Defendant
MHK CO., LTD
Defendant
MI-NI ROOM
Defendant
MINHANH_STORE
Defendant
MORNINGSUN
Represented By
Albert M. Myers
Albert M. Myers
contact info
Defendant
MOTORCYCLE TEE
Defendant
MU66TS_66
Defendant
MURANSIBAIHUO
Defendant
MY ART PAINTING
Defendant
MYUVPRINTED
Defendant
NVSE
Defendant
ORIENTAL_SELECTION
Defendant
OUR STORY
Defendant
PANDATUE
Represented By
Albert M. Myers
Albert M. Myers
contact info
Defendant
PURPLE ART
Defendant
PUTIANSHICHENGXIANGQUXUXIRUIMAOYIYOUXIANGONGSI
Defendant
QIUXIANTONGMUMAOYIYOUXIANGONGSI
Defendant
QYZCAZH-US
Defendant
RED-FREE-HD
Defendant
RENDEZVOUS_5
Defendant
RREP
Defendant
SAOLUIS
Defendant
SEDICOCA
Defendant
SENEW
Defendant
SHEN YANG SHI TIE XI QU XING HAN CHAO LIU FU ZHUAN
Defendant
SHENGLISHANGWU
Defendant
SHENGYIMAO
Defendant
SHUOXIASHANGMAO
Defendant
SHZHAOYU
Represented By
Albert M. Myers
Albert M. Myers
contact info
Defendant
SKY CITY MURAL
Defendant
SUGOYI
Defendant
SULI996
Defendant
SVBRIGHT
Defendant
SYC2747
Defendant
TAIYUANPILEISHANGMAO
Defendant
TANYONDGHENG
Defendant
TAOTAO ALUMINUM SIGN
Defendant
TAOTAO HANGING POSTERS
Defendant
THOMAS DECORATING
Defendant
TUNCHANGWENKEFANWANGLUOKEJIYOUXIANGONGSI
Defendant
UNRESTRAINED
Defendant
VISIT TURBOCIRCUIT INNOVATIONS
Represented By
Albert M. Myers
Albert M. Myers
contact info
Defendant
W-TRENDYHUB
Represented By
Albert M. Myers
Albert M. Myers
contact info
Defendant
WANG SEADRAGON TOYS
Defendant
WEI BIN
Defendant
WEIXIANGHUA
Defendant
WEIXINSHIWEN
Defendant
WEIXUNZHONGKEJIFUWUBU
Defendant
WENZHOUWEIMIAOBAOZHUANGYOUXIANGONGSI.
Defendant
WONDERS ALUMINUM SIGN
Defendant
WOWFYP
Defendant
WULAHEY
Defendant
XANADUC
Defendant
XIOANGSNDBB
Defendant
XMBYHOME
Defendant
XY_GOD
Defendant
Y95INLING
Defendant
YIMATUO
Defendant
YOFEIER
Defendant
YOSIKR DIRECT
Defendant
YOU HAVE A NICE DAY
Defendant
YUTINGHYT
Defendant
ZHANGYIYI SHOP
Defendant
ZHENGDEBIN
Defendant
ZMHLNDF
Defendant
ZUNMAG
Defendant
ZZ ALUMINUM SHOP
Plaintiff
Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC
Represented By
Carrie A. Hanlon
The Sladkus Law Group
contact info
Amy Crout Ziegler
Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.
contact info
Jason Harris Cooper
The Sladkus Law Group
contact info
Justin R. Gaudio
Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
04KT
Terminated: 05/02/2025
Defendant
AARUJJKU
Terminated: 05/02/2025
Defendant
AULEAD
Terminated: 04/22/2025
Defendant
BEKECH
Terminated: 04/22/2025
Defendant
BEYEE
Terminated: 04/25/2025
Defendant
CHENGJYX
Terminated: 05/02/2025
Defendant
COTEEES
Terminated: 05/02/2025
Defendant
DECORATION DRAWING
Terminated: 05/02/2025
Defendant
DRUNKONE
Terminated: 04/25/2025
Defendant
EASU ART
Terminated: 04/22/2025
Defendant
FEI OU
Terminated: 04/25/2025
Defendant
GJMIUIUIUI
Terminated: 04/22/2025
Defendant
GLMYAO
Terminated: 05/02/2025
Defendant
HAPPY STEPS T
Terminated: 05/02/2025
Defendant
HCYYANG
Terminated: 05/02/2025
Defendant
HENHGO
Terminated: 05/02/2025
Defendant
HUALI123
Terminated: 05/02/2025
Defendant
HYMR
Terminated: 05/02/2025
Defendant
IARTTOP
Terminated: 04/25/2025
Defendant
JIBDUBD
Terminated: 05/02/2025
Defendant
JINANHUAJIANJIEFULIANWANG
Terminated: 05/02/2025
Defendant
JINHUIHONGXIN
Terminated: 05/02/2025
Defendant
JUSTHIS
Terminated: 05/02/2025
Defendant
LHIUEM
Terminated: 04/25/2025
Defendant
LIWENLINKART
Terminated: 04/25/2025
Defendant
MINFEN DECORATIVE PLAQU
Terminated: 04/25/2025
Defendant
MUJITECH15
Terminated: 04/25/2025
Defendant
MVFRUG
Terminated: 04/22/2025
Defendant
MXL2021
Terminated: 04/25/2025
Defendant
MZCSDONG
Terminated: 05/02/2025
Defendant
ONSEEN
Terminated: 04/22/2025
Defendant
OREICHAR
Terminated: 05/02/2025
Defendant
PLAUDUCT
Terminated: 05/02/2025
Defendant
QFI_36
Terminated: 04/25/2025
Defendant
RENGGI
Terminated: 04/22/2025
Defendant
SINLEY DECOR
Terminated: 04/25/2025
Defendant
SKYISTS STORE
Terminated: 04/22/2025
Defendant
SOBERTEE
Terminated: 05/02/2025
Defendant
SUPERDANT US
Terminated: 04/25/2025
Defendant
TEEEmall
Terminated: 04/25/2025
Defendant
TENLANG
Terminated: 04/22/2025
Defendant
TREND TRAJECTORY
Terminated: 05/02/2025
Defendant
WIKCER
Terminated: 04/22/2025
Defendant
WILLINGNIAN TOYS
Terminated: 05/02/2025
Defendant
XIANGCHENGSHIZHONGQIUSHANGMAOYOUXIANGONGSI
Terminated: 04/25/2025
Defendant
XYQX
Terminated: 05/02/2025
Defendant
XZ CUSTOM SHOP
Terminated: 04/25/2025
Defendant
YA_830190
Terminated: 04/22/2025
Defendant
YICHUANGSITONG
Terminated: 04/25/2025
Defendant
ZHONGSHENGDINGHANG
Terminated: 05/02/2025


Docket last updated: 21 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Tue 05/20 10:48 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING34 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, with prejudice as to Mi-Ni Room, MHK Co., Ltd, Xy_god, yutinghyt, SAOLUIS, WoWFyP, AWINQQY and You Have a nice day only, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (tas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
34 34 2 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 05/15 12:26 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Round 5) filed by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 10, 2025
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Sat 05/10 1:06 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING33 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Round 4) pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to XMBYhome, Yosikr Direct, AOYH3EQ440YW9, CHO Online, and DULOT. (bgt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
33 33 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 05/08 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Round 4) filed by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
32 32 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 05/06 12:51 PM
ORDER (by docket entry only): Defendants MORNINGSUN, VISIT TURBOCIRCUIT INNOVATIONS, IRON DAN, W-TRENDYHUB, LONGLONG, HANMOTU, SHZHAOYU, PANDATUE, and LUOSIKAI's unopposed motion to extend their answer deadline [ECF31 ] is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. The new deadline is May 14, 2025. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 5/6/2025. (kmj)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Mon 05/05 6:03 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by HANMOTU, IRON DAN, LONGLONG, LUOSIKAI, MORNINGSUN, PANDATUE, SHZHAOYU, VISIT TURBOCIRCUIT INNOVATIONS, W-TRENDYHUB.(Myers, Albert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/05 6:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Albert M. Myers on behalf of HANMOTU, IRON DAN, LONGLONG, LUOSIKAI, MORNINGSUN, PANDATUE, SHZHAOYU, VISIT TURBOCIRCUIT INNOVATIONS, W-TRENDYHUB (Myers, Albert)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Fri 05/02 1:35 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING29 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, without prejudice as to Oreichar, Plauduct, AARUJJKU, HENHGO, Willingnian Toys, Coteees, Happy Steps T, JUSTHIS, SOBERTEE, Trend Trajectory, Decoration drawing, JIBDUBD, Jinanhuajianjiefulianwang, MZCSDONG, Zhongshengdinghang, CHENGJYX, GLMYAO, HCYYANG, Huali123, Hymr, Jinhuihongxin, Xyqx, and 04KT only, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (tas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
29 29 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 05/01 5:32 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Round 3) filed by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Fri 04/25 3:35 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING28 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, without prejudice as to SUPERDANT US, qfi_36, SINLEY DECOR, TEEEmall, XZ CUSTOM Shop, Yichuangsitong, IARTTOP, LHIUEM, Liwenlinkart, BEYEE, Drunkone, Fei Ou, MINFEN Decorative plaque, mujitech15, mxl2021, and Xiangchengshizhongqiushangmaoyouxiangongsi only pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (tas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
28 28 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 04/24 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Round 2) filed by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Tue 04/22 1:35 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, without prejudice as to Skyists store, BEKECH, Gjmiuiuiui, Aulead, Mvfrug, Onseen, Renggi, Tenlang, Wikcer, Easu Art, ya_830190 only, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (tas)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
27 27 misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Mon 04/21 9:52 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER (by docket entry only): Clerk's Notation re: ECF25 ; no conflicts identified. The Court's Order ECF 22 is RESOLVED. Approved by Judge Grimberg. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
25 25 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/18 11:39 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC identifying Other Affiliate Sony Corporation of America, Other Affiliate Sony Group Corporation for Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (Hanlon, Carrie)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Preliminary Injunction Fri 04/18 9:59 AM
PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 4/18/2025. (tas)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Fri 04/18 9:33 AM
ORDER (by docket entry only): Each party must file a certificate of interested persons and a corporate disclosure statement at the time of first appearance. See Local Rule 3.3, NDGa. Plaintiff Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC has not complied with this requirement. Plaintiff is accordingly ORDERED to file its certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement within seven days of this Order. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 4/18/2025. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
23 23 minutes Motion Hearing Fri 04/18 9:59 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steven D. Grimberg: Motion Hearing held on 4/17/2025 re5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Discovery MOTION for Order to Show Cause. The Court heard argument in support of the motion by Plaintiff. The Court GRANTED the Preliminary Injunction. Separate order to follow. (Court Reporter Alicia Bagley)(tas)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 04/17 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Round 1) filed by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Unseal Case Wed 04/16 10:41 AM
ORDER GRANTING17 Motion to Unseal Case. The seal previously imposed pursuant to this Court's Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal [ECF 4] is hereby lifted, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to make all docket entries in this action publicly available. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 4/16/2025. (tas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
19 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC. All Defendants on 4/7/2025, Answers due 4/28/2025. (bgt)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
18 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (bgt)
Related: [-]
17 17 MOTION to Lift Seal by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC.(bgt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
16 16 ORDER GRANTING15 Motion to Extend Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze Order, and Order to Show Cause. The hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is rescheduled and set before the Court on Thursday, April 17, 2025 at 3:00PM EST, either in person at the Richard B. Russell Building, 75 Ted Turner Drive SW, Atlanta, Georgia 30303, Courtroom 1706; or via ZOOM platform, login credentials as follows: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1609450241 Meeting ID: 160 945 0241, ID Passcode: 974502, at which time Defendants and/or any other affected persons may challenge the appropriateness of the TRO and move to dissolve the same and shall appear and show cause why a preliminary injunction should not issue. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 4/2/2025. (tas)
Related: [-]
15 15 MOTION to Extend Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze Order, and Order to Show Cause by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC.(bgt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Clerk's Certificate of E-Mailing as to Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC re16 Order on Motion for Extension of Time. (tas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
14 14 ORDER GRANTING6 MOTION for Authorization to Serve Process on Defendants by Electronic Means Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3). Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 3/26/2025. (adg)
Related: [-]
13 13 31 pgs ORDER GRANTING5 Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, and Order to Show Cause. A Show Cause Hearing is set for 4/4/2025 at 04:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 1706 or or via ZOOM platform, login credentials as follows: Join ZoomGov Meeting https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1618342759 Meeting ID: 161 834 2759 ID Passcode: 175218. before Judge Steven D. Grimberg. After Plaintiff's counsel has received confirmation that the Financial Institutions have restrained Defendants' funds as directed herein, Plaintiff shall serve copies of the Complaint, Motion for TRO, and this Order on each Defendant by electronic mail using email addresses provided by the Marketplaces, Financial Institutions, or Defendants themselves or by other electronic means reasonably calculated to provide notice to all Defendants. Any response or opposition to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction must be filed with the Court and served on Plaintiff's counsel two days before the hearing described in paragraph 13 of this Order, along with Proof of Service. Defendants are on notice that failure to appear at the hearing may result in the imposition of a preliminary injunction against them pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 1116(d), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65, 28 U.S.C. § 1651(a), and the Courts inherent authority.This Order shall become effective on March 26, 2025 at 5:00 pm EST.This Temporary Restraining Order may be extended for good cause. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 3/26/2025. (adg)
Related: [-]
12 12 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 3/26/2025. (tas)
Related: [-]
10 10 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (tas)
Related: [-]
9 9 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (tas)
Related: [-]
Clerk's Certificate of E-Mailing as to Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC re1 Complaint,8 Order on Motion to Seal Document,11 Electronic Summons Issued. (tas)
Related: [-]
Submission of6 MOTION for Service,5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (tas)
Related: [-]
Clerk's Certificate of E-Mailing as to Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC re12 Order. (tas)
Related: [-]
Clerk's Certificate of E-Mailing re,13 Order on Motion for TRO,14 Order on Motion for Service to counsel for Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (adg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
26 26 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Sun 04/20 9:41 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (This document was filed with the other case opening documents on 3/25/2025.) (bgt)
Related: [-]
11 11 Electronic Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (tas)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER GRANTING7 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 3/25/2025. (tas)
Related: [-]
7 7 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC.(tas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
6 6 MOTION for Authorization to Serve Process on Defendants by Electronic Means Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC.(tas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
5 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Expedited Discovery, MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC.(tas). Added MOTION for Discovery, MOTION for Order to Show Cause on 3/26/2025 (adg).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
4 4 NOTICE of Filing Declaration 2 of Justin Gaudio by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (tas)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE of Filing Declaration of Justin Gaudio by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (tas)
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE of Filing Declaration of Jack Schecter by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC.(tas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 part 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 part 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 part 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 3 part 4
1 1 31 pgs COMPLAINT filed by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-14171356)(tas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet