Arkansas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Richard D Taylor
Case #: 6:25-bk-70643
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025

Debtor
Evcon Rentals, Corporation
246 Summer Sweet Trl
Royal, AR 71968-9306
Represented By
Marc Honey
Honey Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Beverly I Brister
Chapter 11 Subchapter V 212 W Sevier
Benton, AR 72015
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee (ust)
Office of U.S. Trustee 200 W Capitol, Ste. 1200
Little Rock, AR 72201


Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/02 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailin Related [+] No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Order Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information (Related Doc 25) Schedules-Documents due 5/14/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 5/14/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/14/2025. Equity Security Holders due 5/14/2025. Entered on Docket 4/30/2025 (Acred, Hannah)
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules Wed 04/30 1:43 PM
Order Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Related [+] Schedules-Documents due 5/14/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 5/14/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/14/2025. Equity Security Holders due 5/14/2025. Entered on Docket 4/30/2025 (Acred, Hannah)
Related: [-] 25
25 25 motion Extend Deadline to File Schedules Wed 04/30 12:46 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Marc Honey on behalf of Evcon Rentals, Corporation (Honey, Marc)
Related: [-]
24 24 1 pgs misc Corporate Resolution Wed 04/30 12:27 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Marc Honey on behalf of Debtor Evcon Rentals, Corporation (Honey, Marc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
23 23 1 pgs misc Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu) Mon 04/28 2:22 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Branch T. Fields Creditor ARVEST BANK (Fields, Branch)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
22 22 9 pgs motion Employ (Motion) Fri 04/25 8:18 AM
Application to Employ Attorney for Debtor Filed by Marc Honey on behalf of Evcon Rentals, Corporation (Honey, Marc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/24 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailin Related [+] No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 04/24/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order Regarding Status Conference Entered on 4/22/2025 (Davis, Patricia) Modified on 4/22/2025 (PD).
20 20 notice Creditor Request for Notice Thu 04/24 5:05 PM
Request by Oakmont Capital Holdings, LLC Designating Mailing Address for Notices pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2002(g)(1), requesting service of copies of all future notices at the address specified in the process of filing this Request Filed by (Dressler, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Wed 04/23 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditor Related [+] No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 04/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Corrected Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/13/2025 at 09:00 AM at Ch. 11 Tele-Meeting of Creditors.
18 18 9 pgs misc Tax Documents Wed 04/23 1:21 PM
Tax Documents for the Year for 2023 filed by Marc Honey Debtor Evcon Rentals, Corporation. (Honey, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
17 17 2 pgs order Order Setting Status Conference Tue 04/22 2:14 PM
Order Regarding Status Conference Entered on 4/22/2025 (Davis, Patricia) Modified on 4/22/2025 (PD)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
16 16 6 pgs motion Authority Mon 04/21 4:13 PM
Motion for Authority Escrow Funds for Advance Fees and Expenses for Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee Filed by Beverly I Brister on behalf of Beverly I Brister (Brister, Beverly)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Authority Mon 04/21 4:05 PM
Motion for Authority to Escrow Funds for Advance Fees and Expenses for Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee Filed by Beverly I Brister on behalf of Beverly I Brister (Brister, Beverly)
Related: [-]
14 14 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Court) Mon 04/21 3:12 PM
Corrected Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/13/2025 at 09:00 AM at Ch. 11 Tele-Meeting of Creditors. (Acred, Hannah)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 11) Mon 04/21 1:17 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements Filed:Voluntary Petition, [Fee Due No] Filed by Marc Honey on behalf of Debtor Evcon Rentals, Corporation (Honey, Marc)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 19, 2025
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 04/19 11:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailin Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Amended Order of Deficiency Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 4/30/2025. Schedules-Documents due 4/30/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 4/30/2025. Corporate Resolution due 4/30/2025.. Equity Security Holders due 4/30/2025. (Acred, Hannah)Modified on 4/17/2025 (HA).
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 04/19 11:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailin Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 DISREGARD - SEE DE 8--Order of Deficiency Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 4/30/2025. Schedules-Documents due 4/30/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 4/30/2025. Corporate Resolution due 4/30/2025. Small Business Statement of Operations due 4/23/2025Small Business Balance Sheet due: 4/23/2025 Federal Income Tax Return due: 4/23/2025. Small Business Cash Flow Statement due 4/23/2025 Equity Security Holders due 4/30/2025. (Acred, Hannah)Modified on 4/17/2025 (HA).
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sat 04/19 11:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditor Related [+] No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 04/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/13/2025 at 09:00 AM at Ch. 11 Tele-Meeting of Creditors.
Thursday, April 17, 2025
9 9 trustee Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (UST) Thu 04/17 11:26 AM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/13/2025 at 09:00 AM at Ch. 11 Tele-Meeting of Creditors. (Poullos, Donna)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs misc Order of Deficiency Thu 04/17 10:26 AM
Amended Order of Deficiency Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 4/30/2025. Schedules-Documents due 4/30/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 4/30/2025. Corporate Resolution due 4/30/2025.. Equity Security Holders due 4/30/2025. (Acred, Hannah)Modified on 4/17/2025 (HA)
Related: [-]
7 7 utility Small Business or SubV Designation Thu 04/17 9:49 AM
Small Business and/or Subchapter V Designation Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 7/15/2025. (Acred, Hannah)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs court Memorandum of Document Deficiency Thu 04/17 9:05 AM
Memorandum of Document Deficiency to Marc Honey Regarding NAICS Code Related [+] (Acred, Hannah)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Evcon Rentals, Corporation. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 07/15/2025.
5 5 1 pgs misc Order of Deficiency Thu 04/17 9:03 AM
DISREGARD - SEE DE 8--Order of Deficiency Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 4/30/2025. Schedules-Documents due 4/30/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 4/30/2025. Corporate Resolution due 4/30/2025. Small Business Statement of Operations due 4/23/2025Small Business Balance Sheet due: 4/23/2025 Federal Income Tax Return due: 4/23/2025. Small Business Cash Flow Statement due 4/23/2025 Equity Security Holders due 4/30/2025. (Acred, Hannah)Modified on 4/17/2025 (HA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
4 4 notice Notice Appointing Ch. 11 Subchapter V Trustee Wed 04/16 3:59 PM
Notice Appointing Ch. 11 Subchapter V Trustee(Poullos, Donna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Verified Statement of Beverly I. Brister, SubV Trustee
3 3 1 pgs misc Small Business Statement of Operations Wed 04/16 1:26 PM
Declaration Regarding Small Business Statement of Operations, Balance Sheet, and Cash Flow Statement Filed by Marc Honey on behalf of Debtor Evcon Rentals, Corporation (Honey, Marc)Modified on 4/17/2025 (HA)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Receipt (Auto) Wed 04/16 1:17 PM
RECEIPT of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:6:25-bk-70643] ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. receipt number A8801810, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 04/16 1:10 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Evcon Rentals, Corporation. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 07/15/2025. (Honey, Marc)
Related: [-]