Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Jane J Boyle
Referred: David L Horan
Case #: 3:25-cv-00935
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 1:51 AM CDT
Defendant
City of Carrollton
Defendant
City of Hurst
Defendant
Maggie Rejino
Plaintiff
Alekzandr Apokalypto
232 Cooper Drive
Hurst, TX 76053


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
8 8 order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply Mon 05/05 12:36 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting7 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. The Petitioner must file within 30 days from today. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 5/5/2025) (Judge Jane J Boyle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 05/01 1:05 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections filed by Alekzandr Apokalypto re:6 Findings and Recommendations. (axm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
6 6 motion Findings and Recommendations Tue 04/22 12:22 PM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE on Case re:3 Complaint. Unless Plaintiff Alekzandr Apokalypto shows through timely objections that he can assert plausible claims that are currently cognizable, the Court should sua sponte dismiss with prejudice his claims against Defendant City of Hurst and sua sponte dismiss without prejudice his claims against Defendants City of Carrollton and Maggie Rejino. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 4/22/2025) (ykp)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 04/22 12:23 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Tue Apr 22 12:23:04 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 04/17 3:07 PM
STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b), this case is hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge David L. Horan for pretrial management. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 4/17/2025) (ykp)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Thu 04/17 3:08 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Thu Apr 17 15:08:08 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 04/16 10:22 AM
Summons Issued as to City of Carrollton, City of Hurst, Maggie Rejino. (agc)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint Wed 04/16 10:15 AM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against City of Carrollton, City of Hurst, Maggie Rejino filed by Alekzandr Apokalypto. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number 300017318) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (agc)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Wed 04/16 10:05 AM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (agc)
Related: [-]
1 1 qcref Boyle Wed 04/16 10:03 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (agc)
Related: [-]