California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Victoria S Kaufman
Case #: 1:25-bk-10638
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 21, 2025

Debtor
17151 Barneston, LLC
17151 Barneston St
Granada Hills, CA 91344-2442
Represented By
Dominic Afzali
Westwood Law Center
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Sandra McBeth (TR)
7343 El Camino Real, #185
Atascadero, CA 93422
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 04/17/2025 12:28 AM PDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 04/16 3:51 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:1:25-bk-10638] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58297708. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 04/16 3:37 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by 17151 Barneston, LLC (Afzali, Dominic)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Wed 04/16 4:12 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee McBeth (TR), Sandra with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/21/2025 at 10:30 AM via Zoom - McBeth: Meeting ID 902 575 1887, Passcode 1216388636, Phone 1 804 552 2201. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]