California Central District Court
Judge:Monica Ramirez Almadani
Referred: Pedro V Castillo
Case #: 2:25-cv-03377
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 1:15 AM PDT
Defendant
Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Represented By
Sabrina Celia Narain
Ltl Attorneys LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Aneesha Sharma


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
7 7 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Wed 04/23 8:17 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. Scheduling Conference set for 6/16/2025 at 1:30 PM. Counsel must email the text-fillable Worksheet to Chambers at MRA_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov along with the Joint Rule 26(f) Report. *See Order for further details.* (gga)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 20, 2025
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Sun 04/20 3:00 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Sun 04/20 3:00 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Sun 04/20 2:59 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (sh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 04/16 6:28 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, (Narain, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 04/16 6:27 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Narain, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 04/16 6:25 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 25STCV07129 Receipt No: ACACDC-39523007 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attorney Sabrina Celia Narain added to party Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC(pty:dft))(Narain, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Sabrina Narain in support of Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-State Court Pleadings,
Att: 3 Exhibit B- Lease Agreement
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Sun 04/20 2:37 PM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Mercedes Benz USA LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Aneesha Sharma. [FILED IN STATE COURT 3/13/2025 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Sun 04/20 2:39 PM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Mercedes Benz USA LLC. [STATE COURT FILE DATE NOT INDICATED SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ](sh)
Related: [-]