New York Northern District Court
Case #: 1:25-mj-00110
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 3:44 AM EDT
Defendant
Eugene Herring (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ashlyn Jessica Miranda
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/17/2025 5:01 AM EDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul J. Evangelista: Initial Appearance as to Eugene Herring held on 4/14/2025. Appearances by AFPD Eric Schillinger for the Defendant; AUSA Ashlyn Miranda for the government. USPO Aimee Messier, present. The Defendant is advised of his rights and the maximum penalties are stated. The Court finds that Defendant does not qualify for assigned counsel at this time and is directed to take steps to retain counsel as soon as possible. The FPD's office remains at table for purposes of the initial appearance only. The government moves for detention as a danger to the community and as a risk of flight and requests a continuance so that a pretrial interview and bail report can be done. A Detention Hearing set for 4/16/2025 @ 1:30 PM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Paul J. Evangelista. The Court issues the oral Rule 5(f) Reminder of Prosecutorial Obligation Order. Defendant is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal, pending the detention hearing. (Court Reporter Lisa Tennyson)[2:13pm-2:30pm] (tab)
Related: [-]
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Eugene Herring (1). (tab)
Related: [-]