Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-01304
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 3:40 AM CDT
Defendant
Miguel Jaramillo-Diaz (1)
Represented By
Jesse R. Coronado
Law Offices Of Jesse R. Coronado
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 04/17/2025 6:43 AM CDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
Arrest of Miguel Jaramillo-Diaz (drda)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
Warrant Returned Executed as to Miguel Jaramillo-Diaz. (drda)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Miguel Jaramillo-Diaz. (drda)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Miguel Jaramillo-Diaz. (drda)
Related: [-]