Michigan Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-20253
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 3:38 AM EDT
Defendant
Antoine Dion McKinney (1)
Represented By
Federal Community Defender
contact info
Mitchell T. Foster
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
C. Barrington Wilkins
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/17/2025 5:52 AM EDT
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman: Initial Appearance as to Antoine Dion McKinney held on 9/18/2024. Detention Hearing set for 9/19/2024 01:00 PM Disposition: Defendant temporarily detained. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Benton Martin) (AUSA: Andrew Picek) (DAll) [2:24-mj-30400-DUTY]
Related: [-]
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE of CJA Attorney Appointment: Mitchell T. Foster has accepted the appointment to represent Antoine Dion McKinney. (Carter, Michael) [2:24-mj-30400-DUTY]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT sworn before Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman as to Antoine Dion McKinney (1). (CCie) [2:24-mj-30400-DUTY]
Related: [-]
3 3 Public Audio File of Initial Appearance as to Antoine Dion McKinney held on 9/18/2024 before Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. AUDIO FILE SIZE (1.9 MB) (MCho) [2:24-mj-30400-DUTY]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDER as to Antoine Dion McKinney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. (KCas) [2:24-mj-30400-DUTY]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER Regarding Brady Materials as to Antoine Dion McKinney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. (KCas) [2:24-mj-30400-DUTY]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING AND FOR TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Antoine Dion McKinney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. (KCas) [2:24-mj-30400-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman: Detention Hearing as to Antoine Dion McKinney NOT held on 9/19/2024, ( Preliminary Examination set for 10/10/2024 01:00 PM ) Disposition: Defendant released on bond. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Mitchell Foster) (AUSA: Andrew Picek) (DAll) [2:24-mj-30400-DUTY]
Related: [-]
7 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mitchell T. Foster appearing for Antoine Dion McKinney . (Foster, Mitchell) [2:24-mj-30400-DUTY]
Related: [-]
8 8 Public Audio File of Proceeding as to Antoine Dion McKinney held on 9/19/2024 before Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. AUDIO FILE SIZE (2.6 MB) (MCho) [2:24-mj-30400-DUTY]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Antoine Dion McKinney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. (DJen) [2:24-mj-30400-DUTY]
Related: [-]
10 10 BOND as to Antoine Dion McKinney in the amount of $10,000.00 unsecured entered. (DJen) [2:24-mj-30400-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
11 11 Warrant for Arrest Returned Executed on 9/18/2024 as to Antoine Dion McKinney. (JHea) [2:24-mj-30400-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
12 12 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Antoine Dion McKinney Time excluded from 10/10/2024 until 11/22/2024. Preliminary Examination adjourned to 11/22/2024 01:00 PM Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut) [2:24-mj-30400-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
13 13 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Antoine Dion McKinney Time excluded from 11/22/2024 until 1/3/2025. Preliminary Examination set for 1/3/2025 01:00 PM Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (DAll)[2:24-mj-30400-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
14 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Antoine Dion McKinney: Time excluded from 1/3/2025 until 3/7/2025. Preliminary Examination reset for 3/7/2025 at 01:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. (DJen) [2:24-mj-30400-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
15 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Antoine Dion McKinney: Time excluded from 3/7/2025 until 5/9/2025. Preliminary Examination reset for 5/9/2025 at 01:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. (DJen) [2:24-mj-30400-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
16 16 INDICTMENT as to Antoine Dion McKinney (1) count(s) 1-2. (JHea)
Related: [-]