Michigan Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-20258
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 3:38 AM EDT
Defendant
Sergio Ruiz-Ruiz (1)
Represented By
Federal Community Defender
contact info
Wyatt G. Harris
W. G. Harris Assoc.
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Susan E. Fairchild
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/17/2025 5:53 AM EDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT sworn before Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman as to Sergio Ruiz-Ruiz (1). (ABun) [2:25-mj-30198-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman: Initial Appearance as to Sergio Ruiz-Ruiz held on 4/3/2025. Detention Hearing set for 4/7/2025 at 01:00 PM. Disposition: Defendant temporarily detained. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Sara Garber) (AUSA: Susan Fairchild)(Court Interpreter: Sara Pallaro) (DJen) [2:25-mj-30198-DUTY]
Related: [-]
3 3 Warrant for Arrest Returned Executed on 4/3/2025 as to Sergio Ruiz-Ruiz. (CShr) [2:25-mj-30198-DUTY]
Related: [-]
4 4 Public Audio File of Initial Appearance as to Sergio Ruiz-Ruiz held on 04/03/2025 before Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. AUDIO FILE SIZE (2.5 MB) (LGra) [2:25-mj-30198-DUTY]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDER as to Sergio Ruiz-Ruiz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. (ABun) [2:25-mj-30198-DUTY]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER Regarding Brady Materials as to Sergio Ruiz-Ruiz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. (ABun) [2:25-mj-30198-DUTY]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING AND FOR TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Sergio Ruiz-Ruiz Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. (ABun) [2:25-mj-30198-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE of CJA Attorney Appointment: Wyatt G. Harris has accepted the appointment to represent Sergio Ruiz-Ruiz. (Carter, Michael) [2:25-mj-30198-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: Detention Hearing adjourned to 4/10/2025 01:00 PM (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Wyatt Harris) (AUSA: Susan Fairchild)(Court Interpreter: Ellen Donahue) (EBut) [2:25-mj-30198-DUTY]
Related: [-]
8 8 Public Audio File of Proceeding as to Sergio Ruiz-Ruiz held on 4/7/2025 before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. AUDIO FILE SIZE (0.7 MB) (MCho) [2:25-mj-30198-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: Detention Hearing as to Sergio Ruiz-Ruiz held on 4/10/2025, ( Preliminary Examination set for 4/17/2025 01:00 PM ) Disposition: Defendant ordered detained. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Wyatt Harris) (AUSA: Eric Straus)(Court Interpreter: Mauricio Decorva) (EBut) [2:25-mj-30198-DUTY]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Sergio Ruiz-Ruiz Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut) [2:25-mj-30198-DUTY]
Related: [-]
10 10 Public Audio File of Detention Hearing as to Sergio Ruiz-Ruiz held on 04/10/2025 before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. AUDIO FILE SIZE (4.2 MB) (THum) [2:25-mj-30198-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
11 11 INFORMATION as to Sergio Ruiz-Ruiz (1) count(s) 1. (ABun)
Related: [-]