Pennsylvania Western District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00107
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Terminated:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 3:47 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Michael Leo Ivory
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
MATTHEW MCELROY (1)
Terminated: 04/15/2025


Docket last updated: 04/17/2025 6:08 AM EDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
1 1 TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION for Supervision of Releasee MATTHEW MCELROY. Received copies of indictment, judgment and docket sheet from Eastern District of Pennsylvania (kjfP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Indictment,
Att: 2 Judgment and Commitment Order,
Att: 3 Revocation Order,
Att: 4 Corrected Revocation Order,
Att: 5 Docket Sheet (District of Maine),
Att: 6 Docket Sheet (Eastern District of Pennsylvania)