Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-01337
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 2:56 AM CDT
Defendant
Asuncion Chigo Ixtepan (1)
Represented By
Monica Elaine Guerrero
Law Office Of Monica E. Guerrero
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 04/17/2025 4:52 AM CDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
Arrest of Asuncion Chigo Ixtepan (drda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
Warrant Returned Executed as to Asuncion Chigo Ixtepan. (drda)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Asuncion Chigo Ixtepan. (drda)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Asuncion Chigo Ixtepan. (drda)
Related: [-]