Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 3:26 AM EDT
Defendant
Roger Lee Patrick (1)
Represented By
Katy J. Cimino
Federal Public Defender Office-Clk.
contact info
Elizabeth B. Gross
Federal Public Defender Office-Clk.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Christie S. Utt
Doj-Usao
contact info
Randolph J. Bernard
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Whg
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/17/2025 5:30 AM EDT
Monday, March 31, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Roger Lee Patrick (1). (Copy to AUSA, M. VanMeter and Agent) (snc) [1:25-mj-00031-TSK-MJA]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Probable Cause
2 2 UNITED STATES' MOTION FOR ORDER TO SEAL as to Roger Lee Patrick. (Copy to AUSA, M. VanMeter and Agent) (snc) [1:25-mj-00031-TSK-MJA]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER TO SEAL granting 2 Motion to Seal as to Roger Lee Patrick (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 03/31/2025. (Copy to AUSA, M. VanMeter and Agent) (snc) [1:25-mj-00031-TSK-MJA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
Arrest of Roger Lee Patrick in Cumberland, MD. (dk) [1:25-mj-00031-TSK-MJA]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed per arrest of Defendant. (dk) [1:25-mj-00031-TSK-MJA]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
6 6 PAPERLESS ORDER as to Roger Lee Patrick, Initial Appearance set for 4/14/2025 09:30 AM in Clarksburg Magistrate Judge Courtroom, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi. This proceeding will be IN PERSON. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 4/11/2025. (nf) Modified to regen NEF to B. Gross on 4/11/2025 (dk). [1:25-mj-00031-TSK-MJA]
Related: [-]
7 7 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Roger Lee Patrick.(Utt, Christie) [1:25-mj-00031-TSK-MJA]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL FOR INITIAL APPEARANCE ONLY as to Roger Lee Patrick. Elizabeth B. Gross is hereby APPOINTED to represent the defendant for the initial appearance only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 4/11/2025. (Copy Dft, FPD, USA, USM, USP) (dk) [1:25-mj-00031-TSK-MJA]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
9 9 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi. Initial Appearance as to Roger Lee Patrick held on 4/14/2025. (Tape #CBG Aloi 1 25 mj 31 USA v Roger Lee Patrick 4 14 2025) (mas) [1:25-mj-00031-TSK-MJA]
Related: [-]
10 10 PAPERLESS ORDER as to Roger Lee Patrick. Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing set for 4/17/2025 01:00 PM in Clarksburg Magistrate Judge Courtroom, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi. These proceedings will be IN PERSON. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 04/14/2025. (nr) Modified to regen NEF to K. Cimino on 4/14/2025 (dk). Modified to correct docket text/NEF regenerated on 4/15/2025 (snc). [1:25-mj-00031-TSK-MJA]
Related: [-]
11 11 ** SEALED ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit as to Roger Lee Patrick. Copy to FPDO by email. (mas) [1:25-mj-00031-TSK-MJA]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION PENDING HEARING PURSUANT TO BAIL REFORM ACT granting 7 Motion as to Roger Lee Patrick (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 4/14/2025. Copy to USMS and USPO by email. (mas) [1:25-mj-00031-TSK-MJA]
Related: [-]
13 13 APPOINTMENT ORDER as to Roger Lee Patrick. Katy J. Cimino appointed as counsel for Roger Lee Patrick appointed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 4/14/2025. (Copy Dft, FPD, USA, USM, USP) (dk) [1:25-mj-00031-TSK-MJA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
Case unsealed as to Roger Lee Patrick. (snc) [1:25-mj-00031-TSK-MJA]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to Roger Lee Patrick. (Unsealed at request of MJ Aloi Chambers (nf)) (snc)
Related: [-]
14 14 MOTION to Continue Preliminary and Detention Hearing by USA as to Roger Lee Patrick. (Utt, Christie) [1:25-mj-00031-TSK-MJA]
Related: [-]
15 15 INDICTMENT as to Roger Lee Patrick (1) count(s) 1. (Copy to AUSA and USMS) (snc)
Related: [-]
16 16 *SEALED* Indictment - Unredacted, re15 Indictment as to Roger Lee Patrick. (snc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Grand Jury Cover Sheet
17 17 UNITED STATES' MOTION FOR ORDER TO SEAL as to Roger Lee Patrick. (snc)
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER TO SEAL granting 17 Motion to Seal as to Roger Lee Patrick (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 04/15/2025. (snc)
Related: [-]
20 20 PAPERLESS ORDER as to Roger Lee Patrick. An Indictment now has been returned against Defendant. Thus, the Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing on the Criminal Complaint set for 4/17/2025 are hereby CANCELLED. Also, pending is the Government's unopposed motion to continue proceedings set for 4/17/2025, which the Court construes as a motion to continue any proceedings to be set on the Indictment. Accordingly, Initial Appearance, Arraignment, and Detention Hearing on the Indictment are set for 4/21/2025 12:30 PM in Clarksburg Magistrate Judge Courtroom, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi. These proceedings will be IN PERSON. Defendant remains detained pursuant to the Court's 12 Order of Temporary Detention of 4/14/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 4/15/2025. (nf)
Related: [-]