California Northern District Court
Judge:Peter H Kang
Case #: 3:25-cv-03399
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Conversion
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 1:53 AM PDT
Defendant
Qatar Airways
Plaintiff
JANE DOE
Represented By
David Russell Shane
Shane Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 27 minutes ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
7 7 misc Proposed Summons Mon 04/21 3:44 PM
Proposed Summons. (Shane, David)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 20, 2025
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Sun 04/20 9:29 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2025 01:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
5 5 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 04/18 8:33 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/2/2025. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/17 1:18 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by JANE DOE . (Shane, David)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Thu 04/17 8:30 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. Use December 2024 form which can be downloaded from https://cand.uscourts.gov/. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetPlease re-file in its entirety. Re:1 Complaint filed by JANE DOE (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
3 3 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/16 6:40 PM
MOTION To Proceed Pseudonymously and to Redact References to Her Name in the Complaint and Attached Exhibits re1 Complaint FOR DAMAGES filed by JANE DOE. Responses due by 4/30/2025. Replies due by 5/7/2025.(Shane, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum of Law In Support of Jane Doe's Motion to Proceed Pseudonymously and to Redact References to Her Name in the Complaint and Attached Exhibits,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Jane Doe In Support of Her Motion to Proceed Pseudonymously and to Redact References to Her Name in the Complaint and Attached Exhibits
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Wed 04/16 6:28 PM
Proposed Summons. (Shane, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/16 6:27 PM
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against Qatar Airways ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20576108.). Filed by JANE DOE.(Shane, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet